| name | name of doctoral school | institution Teljes munkaidejű állás intézménye csillaggal jelölve és vastag betűvel kiemelve. | form of membership | starting date of membership | date of termination of membership |
---|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
| Ágnes Bali Papp | Wittmann Antal Crop-, Animal- and Food Sciences Multidisciplinary Doctoral School | Széchenyi István University, Győr* | Core member | 2016-01-07 | 2023-05-22 |
| Péter Csontos | Wittmann Antal Crop-, Animal- and Food Sciences Multidisciplinary Doctoral School | Széchenyi István University, Győr | Core member | 2019-06-28 | 2024-01-23 |
| Ottó Dóka | Wittmann Antal Crop-, Animal- and Food Sciences Multidisciplinary Doctoral School | Széchenyi István University, Győr* | Core member | 2016-01-07 | 2016-09-15 |
| Borisz Egri | Wittmann Antal Crop-, Animal- and Food Sciences Multidisciplinary Doctoral School | Széchenyi István University, Győr* | Core member | 2016-01-07 | 2024-01-23 |
| Géza Kuroli | Wittmann Antal Crop-, Animal- and Food Sciences Multidisciplinary Doctoral School | Széchenyi István University, Győr* | Core member | 2016-01-07 | 2016-08-24 |
| Vince Ördög | Wittmann Antal Crop-, Animal- and Food Sciences Multidisciplinary Doctoral School | Széchenyi István University, Győr* | Core member | 2016-01-07 | 2022-06-16 |
| Jenő Szigeti | Wittmann Antal Crop-, Animal- and Food Sciences Multidisciplinary Doctoral School | Széchenyi István University, Győr* | Core member | 2016-01-07 | 2023-07-30 |