| name | name of doctoral school | institution Teljes munkaidejű állás intézménye csillaggal jelölve és vastag betűvel kiemelve. | form of membership | starting date of membership | date of termination of membership |
---|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
| András ifj. Benczúr | Doctoral School of Informatics | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2014-09-22 |
| János Demetrovics | Doctoral School of Informatics | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2017-04-11 |
| Imre Kátai | Doctoral School of Informatics | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2015-09-23 |
| Gyula Katona | Doctoral School of Informatics | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2013-10-03 |
| Zoltán Király | Doctoral School of Informatics | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2015-09-23 |
| László Kozma | Doctoral School of Informatics | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2013-10-04 |
| András Lőrincz | Doctoral School of Informatics | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2015-09-23 |
| Ferenc Schipp | Doctoral School of Informatics | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2016-09-30 |
| László (1931-2020) Varga | Doctoral School of Informatics | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2013-10-01 |
| László Zsakó | Doctoral School of Informatics | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2022-08-31 |