Login
Forum
Organisation
officers
member institutions
resolutions (in Hung.)
by-laws (in Hung.)
regulations
Doctoral program
doctoral schools
by institution
by research field
by number
ceased working
academic staff member
by name
by research topic
archives
thesis topic proposals
by doctoral school
by research field
by research topic
supervision of PhD students
search students
Theses defended
by institution
by research field
by name
by date
by doctoral school
Naturalized degrees
by institution
by research field
by name
by date
Habilitation presentations
by institution
by branch of science
by name
Documents (all in Hung.)
public documents
news
legal backgrounds
guidelines
Contacts
contact details
partners
by name
by research topic
archives
archives
name or partial name of the academic staff member
identification number of the doctoral school
form of membership
all
Core member
earlier members
Export data in CSV format
Restore original arrangement
Results: 21 Visible: 1-21
name
name of doctoral school
institution
Teljes munkaidejű állás intézménye csillaggal jelölve és vastag betűvel kiemelve.
form of membership
starting date of membership
date of termination of membership
István Bársony
Chemical Engineering and Material Sciences Doctoral School
University of Pannonia
Core member
2016-08-26
2019-08-20
László Bartha
Chemical Engineering and Material Sciences Doctoral School
University of Pannonia*
Core member
2007-11-01
2013-10-01
Katalin Bélafiné Bakó
Chemical Engineering and Material Sciences Doctoral School
University of Pannonia*
Core member
2007-11-01
2014-09-29
Katalin Bélafiné Bakó
Chemical Engineering and Material Sciences Doctoral School
University of Pannonia*
Core member
2014-09-30
2017-09-07
Tibor Chován
Chemical Engineering and Material Sciences Doctoral School
University of Pannonia*
Core member
2011-07-01
2019-08-20
Etelka Csákiné Tombácz
Chemical Engineering and Material Sciences Doctoral School
University of Pannonia*
Core member
2020-09-11
2022-02-14
Dénes Fodor
Chemical Engineering and Material Sciences Doctoral School
University of Pannonia*
Core member
2014-09-15
2014-12-31
László Gubicza
Chemical Engineering and Material Sciences Doctoral School
University of Pannonia
Core member
2007-11-01
2021-05-31
Jenő Hancsók
Chemical Engineering and Material Sciences Doctoral School
University of Pannonia*
Core member
2007-11-01
2021-05-31
Géza Horváth
Chemical Engineering and Material Sciences Doctoral School
University of Pannonia*
Core member
2007-11-01
2014-09-23
Erzsébet Horváth
Chemical Engineering and Material Sciences Doctoral School
University of Pannonia*
Core member
2007-11-01
2021-08-30
Tatjána Juzsakova
Chemical Engineering and Material Sciences Doctoral School
University of Pannonia*
Core member
2022-02-14
2022-03-22
János Kristóf
Chemical Engineering and Material Sciences Doctoral School
University of Pannonia*
Core member
2007-11-01
2023-12-31
Béla Lakatos
Chemical Engineering and Material Sciences Doctoral School
University of Pannonia
Core member
2007-11-01
2011-09-20
Sándor Németh
Chemical Engineering and Material Sciences Doctoral School
University of Pannonia*
Core member
2014-09-15
2020-08-31
Ákos Rédey
Chemical Engineering and Material Sciences Doctoral School
University of Pannonia*
Core member
2007-11-01
2019-08-20
Ferenc Szeifert
Chemical Engineering and Material Sciences Doctoral School
University of Pannonia*
Core member
2007-11-01
2014-09-23
János Szépvölgyi
Chemical Engineering and Material Sciences Doctoral School
University of Pannonia*
Core member
2016-08-26
2019-08-20
Lászlóné Telegdi
Chemical Engineering and Material Sciences Doctoral School
University of Pannonia
Core member
2007-11-01
2011-11-23
Gábor Várhegyi
Chemical Engineering and Material Sciences Doctoral School
University of Pannonia
Core member
2009-03-02
2016-08-25
Ferenc Vonderviszt
Chemical Engineering and Material Sciences Doctoral School
University of Pannonia
Core member
2016-08-29
2024-05-12
Export data in CSV format
Restore original arrangement
Results: 21 Visible: 1-21
All rights reserved © 2007, Hungarian Doctoral Council. Doctoral Council registration number at commissioner for data protection: 02003/0001. Program version: 2.2358 ( 2017. X. 31. )