| name | name of doctoral school | institution Teljes munkaidejű állás intézménye csillaggal jelölve és vastag betűvel kiemelve. | form of membership | starting date of membership | date of termination of membership |
---|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
| György Inzelt | György Hevesy Doctoral School of Chemistry | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2023-08-14 |
| István Tamás Horváth | György Hevesy Doctoral School of Chemistry | Budapest University of Technology and Economics*; Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2009-04-30 |
| Zoltán Homonnay | György Hevesy Doctoral School of Chemistry | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2021-01-21 |
| Géza Fogarasi | György Hevesy Doctoral School of Chemistry | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2016-03-29 |
| Tibor Gilányi | György Hevesy Doctoral School of Chemistry | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2014-09-30 |
| Ernő Keszei | György Hevesy Doctoral School of Chemistry | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2016-04-13 |
| Ernő Keszei | György Hevesy Doctoral School of Chemistry | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest | Core member | 2019-01-01 | 2019-12-12 |
| Miklós Orbán | György Hevesy Doctoral School of Chemistry | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2016-03-29 |
| József Rábai | György Hevesy Doctoral School of Chemistry | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2023-08-14 |
| Pál Sohár | György Hevesy Doctoral School of Chemistry | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2016-03-29 |
| László Szepes | György Hevesy Doctoral School of Chemistry | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2014-05-07 |
| Attila (1934-2011) Vértes | György Hevesy Doctoral School of Chemistry | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2011-12-31 |
| Miklós Hollósi | György Hevesy Doctoral School of Chemistry | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2014-05-07 |
| György Hajós | György Hevesy Doctoral School of Chemistry | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2022-10-26 |
| Károly Vékey | György Hevesy Doctoral School of Chemistry | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2016-03-18 |
| Gábor Mező | György Hevesy Doctoral School of Chemistry | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2022-10-06 |
| Gábor Mező | György Hevesy Doctoral School of Chemistry | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2022-10-06 | 2023-08-15 |
| Tibor Pasinszki | György Hevesy Doctoral School of Chemistry | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2015-12-03 | 2021-05-13 |