| name | name of doctoral school | institution Teljes munkaidejű állás intézménye csillaggal jelölve és vastag betűvel kiemelve. | form of membership | starting date of membership | date of termination of membership |
---|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
| Lívia Ablonczyné Mihályka | Doctoral School of Regional Sciences and Business Administration | Széchenyi István University, Győr* | Core member | 2013-06-10 | 2014-01-30 |
| Györgyi Barta | Doctoral School of Regional Sciences and Business Administration | Széchenyi István University, Győr* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2017-09-24 |
| Andrea Bencsik | Doctoral School of Regional Sciences and Business Administration | University of Pannonia*; Széchenyi István University, Győr | Core member | 2016-02-29 | 2019-08-31 |
| Andrea Bencsik | Doctoral School of Regional Sciences and Business Administration | University of Pannonia*; Széchenyi István University, Győr | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2015-03-02 |
| Antal Bőhm | Doctoral School of Regional Sciences and Business Administration | Széchenyi István University, Győr | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2011-08-28 |
| Tibor Dőry | Doctoral School of Regional Sciences and Business Administration | Széchenyi István University, Győr* | Core member | 2017-04-25 | 2017-12-15 |
| László Faragó | Doctoral School of Regional Sciences and Business Administration | Széchenyi István University, Győr | Core member | 2015-09-28 | 2020-09-16 |
| Károly Grúber | Doctoral School of Regional Sciences and Business Administration | Széchenyi István University, Győr* | Core member | 2017-09-18 | 2017-12-15 |
| Károly Grúber | Doctoral School of Regional Sciences and Business Administration | Széchenyi István University, Győr* | Core member | 2015-09-28 | 2016-09-01 |
| Károly Grúber | Doctoral School of Regional Sciences and Business Administration | Széchenyi István University, Győr* | Core member | 2013-06-10 | 2014-01-30 |
| Péter Karácsony | Doctoral School of Regional Sciences and Business Administration | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest*; Széchenyi István University, Győr | Core member | 2020-03-10 | 2020-08-01 |
| Mihály Lados | Doctoral School of Regional Sciences and Business Administration | Széchenyi István University, Győr* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2021-12-01 |
| Miklós Losoncz | Doctoral School of Regional Sciences and Business Administration | Budapest Business University*; Széchenyi István University, Győr | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2012-01-31 |
| János Rechnitzer | Doctoral School of Regional Sciences and Business Administration | Széchenyi István University, Győr* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2023-06-22 |
| Péter Róbert | Doctoral School of Regional Sciences and Business Administration | Széchenyi István University, Győr | Core member | 2010-11-27 | 2021-07-12 |
| Edit Somlyódyné Pfeil | Doctoral School of Regional Sciences and Business Administration | Széchenyi István University, Győr* | Core member | 2013-06-10 | 2013-09-03 |
| Gyula Vastag | Doctoral School of Regional Sciences and Business Administration | Széchenyi István University, Győr* | Core member | 2014-02-24 | 2019-07-31 |