Login
Forum
Organisation
officers
member institutions
resolutions (in Hung.)
by-laws (in Hung.)
regulations
Doctoral program
doctoral schools
by institution
by research field
by number
ceased working
academic staff member
by name
by research topic
archives
thesis topic proposals
by doctoral school
by research field
by research topic
supervision of PhD students
search students
Theses defended
by institution
by research field
by name
by date
by doctoral school
Naturalized degrees
by institution
by research field
by name
by date
Habilitation presentations
by institution
by branch of science
by name
Documents (all in Hung.)
public documents
news
legal backgrounds
guidelines
Contacts
contact details
partners
by name
by research topic
archives
archives
name or partial name of the academic staff member
identification number of the doctoral school
form of membership
all
Core member
earlier members
Export data in CSV format
Restore original arrangement
Results: 23 Visible: 1-23
name
name of doctoral school
institution
Teljes munkaidejű állás intézménye csillaggal jelölve és vastag betűvel kiemelve.
form of membership
starting date of membership
date of termination of membership
János Weiss
Doctoral School of Philosophy
University of Pécs*
Core member
2007-11-01
2018-08-29
Róbert Somos
Doctoral School of Philosophy
University of Pécs*
Core member
2007-11-01
2018-08-29
Zsolt Krokovay
Doctoral School of Philosophy
University of Pécs*
Core member
2007-11-01
2011-08-20
Zoltán Bretter
Doctoral School of Philosophy
University of Pécs*
Core member
2014-09-26
2016-04-13
Gábor Szécsi
Doctoral School of Philosophy
University of Pécs*
Core member
2007-11-01
2022-10-26
Gábor Szécsi
Doctoral School of Philosophy
University of Pécs*
Core member
2018-01-01
2022-10-26
Rózsa Bertók
Doctoral School of Philosophy
University of Pécs*
Core member
2011-08-20
2014-12-08
Rózsa Bertók
Doctoral School of Philosophy
University of Pécs*
Core member
2018-04-23
2019-03-22
Tamás Demeter
Doctoral School of Philosophy
Corvinus University of Budapest*
; University of Pécs
Core member
2016-11-29
2018-03-31
Tamás Demeter
Doctoral School of Philosophy
Corvinus University of Budapest*
; University of Pécs
Core member
2019-04-10
2021-01-31
Deodáth Zuh
Doctoral School of Philosophy
University of Pécs*
Core member
2014-09-18
2014-11-30
László Faragó
Doctoral School of Philosophy
University of Pécs
Core member
2014-09-02
2014-09-26
Árpád Csathó
Doctoral School of Philosophy
University of Pécs*
Core member
2018-09-05
2018-10-24
Árpád Csathó
Doctoral School of Philosophy
University of Pécs*
Core member
2019-04-11
2019-10-15
Imre Bús
Doctoral School of Philosophy
University of Pécs*
Core member
2017-12-04
2019-04-11
Miklós Kocsis
Doctoral School of Philosophy
University of Pécs*
Core member
2017-12-04
2019-04-10
Miklós Kocsis
Doctoral School of Philosophy
University of Pécs*
Core member
2019-06-15
2022-04-04
László Tarnay
Doctoral School of Philosophy
University of Pécs*
Core member
2018-04-23
2019-08-30
Gabriella Medvegy
Doctoral School of Philosophy
University of Pécs*
Core member
2018-09-05
2018-09-27
Attila Sík
Doctoral School of Philosophy
University of Pécs*
Core member
2018-04-25
2019-04-11
Attila Sík
Doctoral School of Philosophy
University of Pécs*
Core member
2019-06-15
2019-10-15
Attila Sík
Doctoral School of Philosophy
University of Pécs*
Core member
2022-04-10
2022-12-05
Janka Teodóra Nagy
Doctoral School of Philosophy
University of Pécs*
Core member
2021-06-03
2022-01-25
Export data in CSV format
Restore original arrangement
Results: 23 Visible: 1-23
All rights reserved © 2007, Hungarian Doctoral Council. Doctoral Council registration number at commissioner for data protection: 02003/0001. Program version: 2.2358 ( 2017. X. 31. )