| name | name of doctoral school | institution Teljes munkaidejű állás intézménye csillaggal jelölve és vastag betűvel kiemelve. | form of membership | starting date of membership | date of termination of membership |
---|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
| Judit Gera | Doctoral School of Literary Studies | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2019-05-02 |
| Zsuzsa Hetényi | Doctoral School of Literary Studies | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2024-04-14 |
| Iván Horváth | Doctoral School of Literary Studies | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest | Core member | 2010-10-20 | 2018-04-04 |
| Géza (1959-2017) Kállay | Doctoral School of Literary Studies | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2017-11-17 |
| Zoltán Kenyeres | Doctoral School of Literary Studies | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2016-01-06 |
| Ernő Kulcsár Szabó | Doctoral School of Literary Studies | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2023-03-07 |
| Magdolna Orosz | Doctoral School of Literary Studies | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2022-09-25 |
| Ágnes Péter | Doctoral School of Literary Studies | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2010-10-20 | 2015-02-26 |
| Aladár Sarbu | Doctoral School of Literary Studies | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2014-09-21 |
| László Scholz | Doctoral School of Literary Studies | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2010-10-20 | 2018-08-10 |
| László Scholz | Doctoral School of Literary Studies | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2014-12-12 | 2019-03-18 |
| György Sebestyén | Doctoral School of Literary Studies | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2011-12-02 |
| Mihály (1943–2016) Szegedy-Maszák | Doctoral School of Literary Studies | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2016-07-25 |
| László Tarnói | Doctoral School of Literary Studies | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2014-09-21 |
| György Tverdota | Doctoral School of Literary Studies | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2013-09-11 |
| Enikő Bollobás | Doctoral School of Literary Studies | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2013-09-01 | 2022-11-16 |
| Márta Csepregi | Doctoral School of Literary Studies | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest | Core member | 2013-07-04 | 2015-02-26 |
| Ágnes Dukkon | Doctoral School of Literary Studies | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2013-07-04 | 2017-02-09 |
| György Eisemann | Doctoral School of Literary Studies | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2023-03-07 |
| Győző Ferencz | Doctoral School of Literary Studies | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2013-07-04 | 2019-04-04 |
| Krisztina Horváth | Doctoral School of Literary Studies | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2013-07-04 | 2015-02-26 |
| Imre Kurdi | Doctoral School of Literary Studies | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2014-03-06 | 2015-02-26 |
| Péter Milosevits | Doctoral School of Literary Studies | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2014-07-01 |
| Gábor Schein | Doctoral School of Literary Studies | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2013-07-04 | 2014-09-27 |
| Imre Szabics | Doctoral School of Literary Studies | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2011-12-02 |
| Endre Szkárosi | Doctoral School of Literary Studies | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2015-02-26 |
| Ákos Farkas | Doctoral School of Literary Studies | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2013-07-04 | 2015-02-26 |
| Ferenc Pál | Doctoral School of Literary Studies | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest | Core member | 2013-07-04 | 2014-05-05 |
| Péter Kiszl | Doctoral School of Literary Studies | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2014-03-06 | 2015-02-26 |