Login
Forum
Organisation
officers
member institutions
resolutions (in Hung.)
by-laws (in Hung.)
regulations
Doctoral program
doctoral schools
by institution
by research field
by number
ceased working
academic staff member
by name
by research topic
archives
thesis topic proposals
by doctoral school
by research field
by research topic
supervision of PhD students
search students
Theses defended
by institution
by research field
by name
by date
by doctoral school
Naturalized degrees
by institution
by research field
by name
by date
Habilitation presentations
by institution
by branch of science
by name
Documents (all in Hung.)
public documents
news
legal backgrounds
guidelines
Contacts
contact details
partners
by name
by research topic
archives
archives
name or partial name of the academic staff member
identification number of the doctoral school
form of membership
all
Core member
earlier members
Export data in CSV format
Restore original arrangement
Results: 17 Visible: 1-17
name
name of doctoral school
institution
Teljes munkaidejű állás intézménye csillaggal jelölve és vastag betűvel kiemelve.
form of membership
starting date of membership
date of termination of membership
József Bakos
Doctoral School of Chemistry and Environmental Sciences
University of Pannonia*
Core member
2009-02-02
2013-09-02
András Dallos
Doctoral School of Chemistry and Environmental Sciences
University of Pannonia
Core member
2013-07-12
2017-10-30
Péter Hajós
Doctoral School of Chemistry and Environmental Sciences
University of Pannonia
Core member
2013-09-01
2013-09-25
Péter Hajós
Doctoral School of Chemistry and Environmental Sciences
University of Pannonia
Core member
2009-02-02
2013-09-25
Attila Horváth
Doctoral School of Chemistry and Environmental Sciences
University of Pannonia*
Core member
2009-02-02
2016-05-18
Nóra Kováts
Doctoral School of Chemistry and Environmental Sciences
University of Pannonia*
Core member
2013-07-12
2013-10-03
Károly Lázár
Doctoral School of Chemistry and Environmental Sciences
University of Pannonia*
Core member
2009-02-02
2015-12-11
Ernő Mészáros
Doctoral School of Chemistry and Environmental Sciences
University of Pannonia*
Core member
2009-02-02
2013-09-24
Tamás Pap
Doctoral School of Chemistry and Environmental Sciences
University of Pannonia*
Core member
2009-02-02
2013-07-12
Rita Skodáné Földes
Doctoral School of Chemistry and Environmental Sciences
University of Pannonia*
Core member
2009-02-02
2022-03-22
János Somlai
Doctoral School of Chemistry and Environmental Sciences
University of Pannonia*
Core member
2009-02-02
2017-09-05
Gábor Speier
Doctoral School of Chemistry and Environmental Sciences
University of Pannonia
Core member
2013-07-12
2013-09-30
Rita Szakácsné Földényi
Doctoral School of Chemistry and Environmental Sciences
University of Pannonia*
Core member
2013-07-12
2014-01-02
István Szalai
Doctoral School of Chemistry and Environmental Sciences
University of Pannonia*
Core member
2009-02-02
2014-09-10
Erzsébet Takács
Doctoral School of Chemistry and Environmental Sciences
University of Pannonia
Core member
2009-02-02
2011-10-20
Kálmán Varga
Doctoral School of Chemistry and Environmental Sciences
University of Pannonia*
Core member
2009-02-02
2012-12-31
László Wojnárovits
Doctoral School of Chemistry and Environmental Sciences
University of Pannonia
Core member
2009-02-02
2013-07-12
Export data in CSV format
Restore original arrangement
Results: 17 Visible: 1-17
All rights reserved © 2007, Hungarian Doctoral Council. Doctoral Council registration number at commissioner for data protection: 02003/0001. Program version: 2.2358 ( 2017. X. 31. )