| name | name of doctoral school | institution Teljes munkaidejű állás intézménye csillaggal jelölve és vastag betűvel kiemelve. | form of membership | starting date of membership | date of termination of membership |
---|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
| István Vingender | Doctoral School of Health Sciences | Semmelweis University, Budapest* | Core member | 2019-03-29 | 2023-08-31 |
| Péter Sótonyi | Doctoral School of Health Sciences | Semmelweis University, Budapest* | Core member | 2019-03-29 | 2023-08-31 |
| János Rigó | Doctoral School of Health Sciences | Semmelweis University, Budapest* | Core member | 2020-09-08 | 2023-08-31 |
| Péter Nyirády | Doctoral School of Health Sciences | Semmelweis University, Budapest* | Core member | 2019-06-11 | 2023-09-01 |
| Csaba Nyakas | Doctoral School of Health Sciences | Semmelweis University, Budapest* | Core member | 2019-03-27 | 2023-08-31 |
| Zoltán Zsolt Nagy | Doctoral School of Health Sciences | Semmelweis University, Budapest* | Core member | 2019-04-02 | 2023-08-31 |
| Balázs Győrffy | Doctoral School of Health Sciences | Semmelweis University, Budapest* | Core member | 2020-07-13 | 2023-08-31 |
| Katalin Földvári-Nagy Lászlóné Lenti | Doctoral School of Health Sciences | Semmelweis University, Budapest* | Core member | 2019-03-29 | 2023-08-31 |
| Károly Cseh | Doctoral School of Health Sciences | Semmelweis University, Budapest* | Core member | 2020-07-13 | 2023-08-31 |
| Nándor Ács | Doctoral School of Health Sciences | Semmelweis University, Budapest* | Core member | 2019-04-02 | 2023-08-31 |