Login
Forum
Organisation
officers
member institutions
resolutions (in Hung.)
by-laws (in Hung.)
regulations
Doctoral program
doctoral schools
by institution
by research field
by number
ceased working
academic staff member
by name
by research topic
archives
thesis topic proposals
by doctoral school
by research field
by research topic
supervision of PhD students
search students
Theses defended
by institution
by research field
by name
by date
by doctoral school
Naturalized degrees
by institution
by research field
by name
by date
Habilitation presentations
by institution
by branch of science
by name
Documents (all in Hung.)
public documents
news
legal backgrounds
guidelines
Contacts
contact details
partners
by name
by research topic
archives
archives
name or partial name of the academic staff member
identification number of the doctoral school
form of membership
all
Core member
earlier members
Export data in CSV format
Restore original arrangement
Results: 32 Visible: 1-32
name
name of doctoral school
institution
Teljes munkaidejű állás intézménye csillaggal jelölve és vastag betűvel kiemelve.
form of membership
starting date of membership
date of termination of membership
Erzsébet Szeréna Zoltán
Marcell Breuer Doctoral School
University of Pécs*
Core member
2007-11-01
2011-02-02
László Zobor
Marcell Breuer Doctoral School
University of Pécs
Core member
2012-08-29
2013-08-26
Zoltán Tóth
Marcell Breuer Doctoral School
University of Pécs*
Core member
2007-11-01
2020-09-06
Éva Szabó
Marcell Breuer Doctoral School
University of Pécs*
Core member
2012-09-07
2019-03-17
Éva Szabó
Marcell Breuer Doctoral School
University of Pécs*
Core member
2007-11-01
2011-02-02
János Stirling
Marcell Breuer Doctoral School
University of Pécs*
Core member
2010-09-18
2013-08-26
Csaba Rohoska
Marcell Breuer Doctoral School
Universitas Budensis*
; University of Pécs
Core member
2012-09-07
2015-10-15
Donát Rétfalvi
Marcell Breuer Doctoral School
University of Pécs*
Core member
2012-09-07
2013-08-26
László Perényi
Marcell Breuer Doctoral School
University of Pécs*
Core member
2009-02-06
2011-02-02
Gabriella Medvegy
Marcell Breuer Doctoral School
University of Pécs*
Core member
2014-06-03
2014-08-22
Gabriella Medvegy
Marcell Breuer Doctoral School
University of Pécs*
Core member
2012-09-07
2013-09-12
Ágnes Lindenbach
Marcell Breuer Doctoral School
University of Pécs*
Core member
2013-02-18
2021-04-15
Ágnes Lindenbach
Marcell Breuer Doctoral School
University of Pécs*
Core member
2010-09-30
2011-02-02
Péter Lenkei
Marcell Breuer Doctoral School
University of Pécs*
Core member
2009-03-02
2018-10-02
Krisztián Kovács-Andor
Marcell Breuer Doctoral School
University of Pécs*
Core member
2014-06-03
2014-08-22
Krisztián Kovács-Andor
Marcell Breuer Doctoral School
University of Pécs*
Core member
2012-09-07
2013-09-12
Orsolya Kovács
Marcell Breuer Doctoral School
University of Pécs*
Core member
2012-09-07
2013-08-26
Orsolya Kovács
Marcell Breuer Doctoral School
University of Pécs*
Core member
2007-11-01
2011-02-02
Tamás Kondor
Marcell Breuer Doctoral School
University of Pécs*
Core member
2012-09-07
2021-04-06
István Kistelegdi
Marcell Breuer Doctoral School
University of Pécs*
Core member
2007-11-01
2020-08-22
Miklós Iványi
Marcell Breuer Doctoral School
University of Pécs*
Core member
2013-08-26
2014-08-22
Miklós Iványi
Marcell Breuer Doctoral School
University of Pécs*
Core member
2009-02-06
2013-08-26
István ifj. Kistelegdi
Marcell Breuer Doctoral School
Universitas Budensis*
; University of Pécs
Core member
2012-09-07
2023-09-01
István ifj. Kistelegdi
Marcell Breuer Doctoral School
Universitas Budensis*
; University of Pécs
Core member
2007-11-01
2011-02-02
Mátyás Hübner
Marcell Breuer Doctoral School
University of Pécs*
Core member
2007-11-01
2013-08-26
Mátyás Hübner
Marcell Breuer Doctoral School
University of Pécs*
Core member
2013-08-26
2014-09-08
Tamás Getto
Marcell Breuer Doctoral School
Moholy-Nagy University of Art and Design, Budapest*
; University of Pécs
Core member
2012-12-10
2018-09-03
Sándor Dévényi
Marcell Breuer Doctoral School
University of Pécs*
Core member
2009-10-20
2021-04-15
Anikó Csébfalvi
Marcell Breuer Doctoral School
University of Pécs*
Core member
2014-04-28
2021-04-15
István Bede
Marcell Breuer Doctoral School
University of Pécs
Core member
2012-09-07
2014-08-22
Bálint Bachmann
Marcell Breuer Doctoral School
University of Pécs*
Core member
2007-11-01
2011-02-02
Zoltán Bachman
Marcell Breuer Doctoral School
University of Pécs*
Core member
2007-11-01
2015-04-27
Export data in CSV format
Restore original arrangement
Results: 32 Visible: 1-32
All rights reserved © 2007, Hungarian Doctoral Council. Doctoral Council registration number at commissioner for data protection: 02003/0001. Program version: 2.2358 ( 2017. X. 31. )