Login
Forum
Organisation
officers
member institutions
resolutions (in Hung.)
by-laws (in Hung.)
regulations
Doctoral program
doctoral schools
by institution
by research field
by number
ceased working
academic staff member
by name
by research topic
archives
thesis topic proposals
by doctoral school
by research field
by research topic
supervision of PhD students
search students
Theses defended
by institution
by research field
by name
by date
by doctoral school
Naturalized degrees
by institution
by research field
by name
by date
Habilitation presentations
by institution
by branch of science
by name
Documents (all in Hung.)
public documents
news
legal backgrounds
guidelines
Contacts
contact details
partners
by name
by research topic
archives
archives
name or partial name of the academic staff member
identification number of the doctoral school
form of membership
all
Core member
earlier members
Export data in CSV format
Restore original arrangement
Results: 14 Visible: 1-14
name
name of doctoral school
institution
Teljes munkaidejű állás intézménye csillaggal jelölve és vastag betűvel kiemelve.
form of membership
starting date of membership
date of termination of membership
Iván Major
Doctoral School of Business and Management
Budapest University of Technology and Economics*
; University of Pannonia
Core member
2007-11-01
2009-03-17
Zsuzsanna Bacsi
Doctoral School of Business and Management
Hungarian University of Agriculture and Life Sciences, Gödöllő*
; University of Pannonia
Core member
2007-11-01
2020-07-31
Péter Mihályi
Doctoral School of Business and Management
Corvinus University of Budapest*
; University of Pannonia
Core member
2007-11-01
2016-02-07
Tibor Pupos
Doctoral School of Business and Management
University of Pannonia
Core member
2007-11-01
2019-08-31
Mihály Laki
Doctoral School of Business and Management
University of Pannonia
Core member
2007-11-01
2012-04-02
Zoltán Gaál
Doctoral School of Business and Management
University of Pannonia*
Core member
2007-11-01
2022-01-31
Lajos Szabó
Doctoral School of Business and Management
Corvinus University of Budapest*
; University of Pannonia
Core member
2011-09-01
2016-07-21
Péter Halmai
Doctoral School of Business and Management
Budapest University of Technology and Economics*
; University of Pannonia
Core member
2011-11-02
2016-09-30
Andrea Elekes
Doctoral School of Business and Management
Budapest University of Technology and Economics*
; University of Pannonia
Core member
2014-07-04
2016-02-17
András Telcs
Doctoral School of Business and Management
University of Pannonia*
Core member
2011-01-15
2012-02-20
András Telcs
Doctoral School of Business and Management
University of Pannonia*
Core member
2012-07-04
2012-09-11
Gyula Vastag
Doctoral School of Business and Management
Széchenyi István University, Győr*
; University of Pannonia
Core member
2011-09-26
2014-03-03
Alan Clarke
Doctoral School of Business and Management
University of Pannonia*
Core member
2019-03-27
2021-02-19
Mihály Görög
Doctoral School of Business and Management
University of Pannonia*
Core member
2019-03-27
2021-09-20
Export data in CSV format
Restore original arrangement
Results: 14 Visible: 1-14
All rights reserved © 2007, Hungarian Doctoral Council. Doctoral Council registration number at commissioner for data protection: 02003/0001. Program version: 2.2358 ( 2017. X. 31. )