| name | name of doctoral school | institution Teljes munkaidejű állás intézménye csillaggal jelölve és vastag betűvel kiemelve. | form of membership | starting date of membership | date of termination of membership |
---|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
| István Antal | Doctoral School of Pharmaceutical Sciences | Semmelweis University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2023-08-31 |
| Szabolcs Béni | Doctoral School of Pharmaceutical Sciences | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest*; Semmelweis University, Budapest | Core member | 2019-07-15 | 2023-08-31 |
| Péter Ferdinandy | Doctoral School of Pharmaceutical Sciences | Semmelweis University, Budapest* | Core member | 2019-07-15 | 2023-08-31 |
| Zsuzsanna Fürst | Doctoral School of Pharmaceutical Sciences | Semmelweis University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2023-08-31 |
| Klára Gyires | Doctoral School of Pharmaceutical Sciences | Semmelweis University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2020-10-19 |
| György Kéri | Doctoral School of Pharmaceutical Sciences | Semmelweis University, Budapest | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2016-08-01 |
| Imre Klebovich | Doctoral School of Pharmaceutical Sciences | Semmelweis University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2020-10-18 |
| Péter Lakatos | Doctoral School of Pharmaceutical Sciences | Semmelweis University, Budapest* | Core member | 2012-04-17 | 2023-08-31 |
| Kálmán Magyar | Doctoral School of Pharmaceutical Sciences | Semmelweis University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2017-11-20 |
| Sylvia Marton | Doctoral School of Pharmaceutical Sciences | Semmelweis University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2015-05-24 |
| Péter Mátyus | Doctoral School of Pharmaceutical Sciences | Semmelweis University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2017-12-19 |
| Béla Noszál | Doctoral School of Pharmaceutical Sciences | Semmelweis University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2020-10-18 |
| László Őrfi | Doctoral School of Pharmaceutical Sciences | Semmelweis University, Budapest* | Core member | 2019-07-15 | 2023-08-31 |
| Éva Szőke | Doctoral School of Pharmaceutical Sciences | Semmelweis University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2014-09-28 |
| Éva Szökő | Doctoral School of Pharmaceutical Sciences | Semmelweis University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2023-08-31 |
| Krisztina Takácsné Novák | Doctoral School of Pharmaceutical Sciences | Semmelweis University, Budapest* | Core member | 2019-07-15 | 2023-08-31 |
| Kornélia Tekes | Doctoral School of Pharmaceutical Sciences | Semmelweis University, Budapest* | Core member | 2013-10-01 | 2020-10-18 |
| Tamás Török | Doctoral School of Pharmaceutical Sciences | Semmelweis University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2011-12-15 |
| László Tóthfalusi | Doctoral School of Pharmaceutical Sciences | Semmelweis University, Budapest* | Core member | 2019-07-15 | 2023-08-31 |
| Zoltán Vincze | Doctoral School of Pharmaceutical Sciences | Semmelweis University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2014-09-25 |
| Romána Zelkó | Doctoral School of Pharmaceutical Sciences | Semmelweis University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2023-08-31 |
| Miklós Zrínyi | Doctoral School of Pharmaceutical Sciences | Semmelweis University, Budapest* | Core member | 2013-10-01 | 2020-10-18 |