| name | name of doctoral school | institution Teljes munkaidejű állás intézménye csillaggal jelölve és vastag betűvel kiemelve. | form of membership | starting date of membership | date of termination of membership |
---|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
| Gábor Bakonyi | Doctoral School of Biological Sciences | Hungarian University of Agriculture and Life Sciences, Gödöllő | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2014-04-03 |
| Beáta Barnabás | Doctoral School of Biological Sciences | Hungarian University of Agriculture and Life Sciences, Gödöllő | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2014-05-30 |
| György Dénes Bisztray | Doctoral School of Biological Sciences | Hungarian University of Agriculture and Life Sciences, Gödöllő* | Core member | 2016-04-06 | 2023-09-14 |
| József Burgyán | Doctoral School of Biological Sciences | Hungarian University of Agriculture and Life Sciences, Gödöllő | Core member | 2011-06-30 | 2014-05-30 |
| Zsolt Csintalan | Doctoral School of Biological Sciences | Hungarian University of Agriculture and Life Sciences, Gödöllő* | Core member | 2018-02-06 | 2019-03-04 |
| Zsolt Csintalan | Doctoral School of Biological Sciences | Hungarian University of Agriculture and Life Sciences, Gödöllő* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2016-04-06 |
| László Haszpra | Doctoral School of Biological Sciences | Hungarian University of Agriculture and Life Sciences, Gödöllő | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2017-09-07 |
| László Haszpra | Doctoral School of Biological Sciences | Hungarian University of Agriculture and Life Sciences, Gödöllő | Core member | 2017-12-04 | 2019-04-11 |
| László Hornok | Doctoral School of Biological Sciences | Hungarian University of Agriculture and Life Sciences, Gödöllő* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2018-01-23 |
| László Horváth | Doctoral School of Biological Sciences | Hungarian University of Agriculture and Life Sciences, Gödöllő | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2014-04-03 |
| György Botond Kiss | Doctoral School of Biological Sciences | Hungarian University of Agriculture and Life Sciences, Gödöllő | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2013-08-31 |
| Ferenc Olasz | Doctoral School of Biological Sciences | Hungarian University of Agriculture and Life Sciences, Gödöllő | Core member | 2019-03-04 | 2019-04-09 |
| Kálmán Rajkai | Doctoral School of Biological Sciences | Hungarian University of Agriculture and Life Sciences, Gödöllő | Core member | 2015-04-10 | 2021-05-24 |
| Katalin Salánki | Doctoral School of Biological Sciences | Hungarian University of Agriculture and Life Sciences, Gödöllő | Core member | 2015-04-07 | 2015-08-25 |
| János Vetter | Doctoral School of Biological Sciences | University of Veterinary Medicine Budapest*; Hungarian University of Agriculture and Life Sciences, Gödöllő | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2016-07-01 |