Login
Forum
Organisation
officers
member institutions
resolutions (in Hung.)
by-laws (in Hung.)
regulations
Doctoral program
doctoral schools
by institution
by research field
by number
ceased working
academic staff member
by name
by research topic
archives
thesis topic proposals
by doctoral school
by research field
by research topic
supervision of PhD students
search students
Theses defended
by institution
by research field
by name
by date
by doctoral school
Naturalized degrees
by institution
by research field
by name
by date
Habilitation presentations
by institution
by branch of science
by name
Documents (all in Hung.)
public documents
news
legal backgrounds
guidelines
Contacts
contact details
partners
by name
by research topic
archives
archives
name or partial name of the academic staff member
identification number of the doctoral school
form of membership
all
Core member
earlier members
Export data in CSV format
Restore original arrangement
Results: 34 Visible: 1-34
name
name of doctoral school
institution
Teljes munkaidejű állás intézménye csillaggal jelölve és vastag betűvel kiemelve.
form of membership
starting date of membership
date of termination of membership
István Grigorszky
Pál Juhász-Nagy Doctoral School of Biology and Environmental Sciences
University of Debrecen*
Core member
2007-11-01
2015-09-29
Péter Bíró
Pál Juhász-Nagy Doctoral School of Biology and Environmental Sciences
University of Debrecen
Core member
2007-11-01
2014-09-15
Gyula Lakatos
Pál Juhász-Nagy Doctoral School of Biology and Environmental Sciences
University of Debrecen
Core member
2007-11-01
2014-09-17
Sándor Alex Nagy
Pál Juhász-Nagy Doctoral School of Biology and Environmental Sciences
University of Debrecen*
Core member
2007-11-01
2011-01-25
Sándor Alex Nagy
Pál Juhász-Nagy Doctoral School of Biology and Environmental Sciences
University of Debrecen*
Core member
2013-09-16
2015-09-29
Zoltán Sándor Varga
Pál Juhász-Nagy Doctoral School of Biology and Environmental Sciences
University of Debrecen*
Core member
2007-11-01
2013-10-04
Lajos Vörös
Pál Juhász-Nagy Doctoral School of Biology and Environmental Sciences
University of Debrecen
Core member
2007-11-01
2014-09-15
Katalin Pecsenye
Pál Juhász-Nagy Doctoral School of Biology and Environmental Sciences
University of Debrecen*
Core member
2007-11-01
2013-10-05
István András Rácz
Pál Juhász-Nagy Doctoral School of Biology and Environmental Sciences
University of Debrecen
Core member
2007-11-01
2011-01-25
László Papp
Pál Juhász-Nagy Doctoral School of Biology and Environmental Sciences
University of Debrecen
Core member
2007-11-01
2013-10-04
Ilona Mészáros
Pál Juhász-Nagy Doctoral School of Biology and Environmental Sciences
University of Debrecen*
Core member
2007-11-01
2015-09-27
Szabolcs Lengyel
Pál Juhász-Nagy Doctoral School of Biology and Environmental Sciences
University of Debrecen
Core member
2007-11-01
2011-01-25
Gábor Matus
Pál Juhász-Nagy Doctoral School of Biology and Environmental Sciences
University of Debrecen*
Core member
2007-11-01
2011-01-25
Gábor Matus
Pál Juhász-Nagy Doctoral School of Biology and Environmental Sciences
University of Debrecen*
Core member
2013-09-16
2015-09-28
Mihály Braun
Pál Juhász-Nagy Doctoral School of Biology and Environmental Sciences
University of Debrecen
Core member
2007-11-01
2011-01-25
Mátyás Sipiczki
Pál Juhász-Nagy Doctoral School of Biology and Environmental Sciences
University of Debrecen*
Core member
2007-11-01
2015-10-01
István Jóna
Pál Juhász-Nagy Doctoral School of Biology and Environmental Sciences
University of Debrecen*
Core member
2007-11-01
2017-04-11
Gáspár Bánfalvi
Pál Juhász-Nagy Doctoral School of Biology and Environmental Sciences
University of Debrecen
Core member
2007-11-01
2013-10-04
Attila Szentirmai
Pál Juhász-Nagy Doctoral School of Biology and Environmental Sciences
University of Debrecen*
Core member
2007-11-01
2013-09-16
István Pócsi
Pál Juhász-Nagy Doctoral School of Biology and Environmental Sciences
University of Debrecen*
Core member
2007-11-01
2016-10-01
Ida Miklós
Pál Juhász-Nagy Doctoral School of Biology and Environmental Sciences
University of Debrecen*
Core member
2013-09-16
2013-09-27
Levente Karaffa
Pál Juhász-Nagy Doctoral School of Biology and Environmental Sciences
University of Debrecen*
Core member
2007-11-01
2015-09-30
Tamás Emri
Pál Juhász-Nagy Doctoral School of Biology and Environmental Sciences
University of Debrecen*
Core member
2007-11-01
2015-09-29
Erzsébet Fekete
Pál Juhász-Nagy Doctoral School of Biology and Environmental Sciences
University of Debrecen*
Core member
2013-09-16
2013-09-27
János Kerékgyártó
Pál Juhász-Nagy Doctoral School of Biology and Environmental Sciences
University of Debrecen*
Core member
2013-09-16
2013-10-05
Csaba Máthé
Pál Juhász-Nagy Doctoral School of Biology and Environmental Sciences
University of Debrecen*
Core member
2007-11-01
2011-01-25
Attila Molnár V.
Pál Juhász-Nagy Doctoral School of Biology and Environmental Sciences
University of Debrecen*
Core member
2013-09-16
2017-08-31
Gábor Vasas
Pál Juhász-Nagy Doctoral School of Biology and Environmental Sciences
University of Debrecen*
Core member
2007-11-01
2011-01-25
Gábor Vasas
Pál Juhász-Nagy Doctoral School of Biology and Environmental Sciences
University of Debrecen*
Core member
2013-09-16
2015-09-30
Gábor Borics
Pál Juhász-Nagy Doctoral School of Biology and Environmental Sciences
University of Debrecen
Core member
2013-09-16
2013-09-27
Péter Török
Pál Juhász-Nagy Doctoral School of Biology and Environmental Sciences
University of Debrecen*
Core member
2013-09-13
2013-10-05
Péter Török
Pál Juhász-Nagy Doctoral School of Biology and Environmental Sciences
University of Debrecen*
Core member
2013-09-16
2013-10-05
Péter Török
Pál Juhász-Nagy Doctoral School of Biology and Environmental Sciences
University of Debrecen*
Core member
2013-10-05
2015-09-29
Tünde Pusztahelyi
Pál Juhász-Nagy Doctoral School of Biology and Environmental Sciences
University of Debrecen*
Core member
2009-03-11
2011-01-25
Export data in CSV format
Restore original arrangement
Results: 34 Visible: 1-34
All rights reserved © 2007, Hungarian Doctoral Council. Doctoral Council registration number at commissioner for data protection: 02003/0001. Program version: 2.2358 ( 2017. X. 31. )