| name | name of doctoral school | institution Teljes munkaidejű állás intézménye csillaggal jelölve és vastag betűvel kiemelve. | form of membership | starting date of membership | date of termination of membership |
---|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
| József Stefler | Doctoral School of Animal Science | University of Kaposvár* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2014-09-17 |
| Melinda Kovács | Doctoral School of Animal Science | Hungarian University of Agriculture and Life Sciences, Gödöllő*; University of Kaposvár | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2020-10-14 |
| Péter Horn | Doctoral School of Animal Science | Hungarian University of Agriculture and Life Sciences, Gödöllő*; University of Kaposvár | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2020-10-14 |
| László Babinszky | Doctoral School of Animal Science | University of Kaposvár | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2010-12-01 |
| Csaba Hancz | Doctoral School of Animal Science | Hungarian University of Agriculture and Life Sciences, Gödöllő*; University of Kaposvár | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2020-10-14 |
| István Holló | Doctoral School of Animal Science | Hungarian University of Agriculture and Life Sciences, Gödöllő*; University of Kaposvár | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2020-10-14 |
| Attila Lengyel | Doctoral School of Animal Science | University of Kaposvár* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2012-02-23 |
| Zsolt Szendrő | Doctoral School of Animal Science | Hungarian University of Agriculture and Life Sciences, Gödöllő*; University of Kaposvár | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2020-10-14 |
| Ferenc Bogenfürst | Doctoral School of Animal Science | University of Kaposvár* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2013-09-17 |
| Imre Repa | Doctoral School of Animal Science | Hungarian University of Agriculture and Life Sciences, Gödöllő*; University of Kaposvár | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2017-07-08 |
| Imre Repa | Doctoral School of Animal Science | Hungarian University of Agriculture and Life Sciences, Gödöllő*; University of Kaposvár | Core member | 2015-07-22 | 2017-07-08 |
| Róbert Romvári | Doctoral School of Animal Science | Hungarian University of Agriculture and Life Sciences, Gödöllő*; University of Kaposvár | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2020-10-14 |
| János Csapó | Doctoral School of Animal Science | University of Kaposvár | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2014-01-31 |
| István Nagy | Doctoral School of Animal Science | Hungarian University of Agriculture and Life Sciences, Gödöllő*; University of Kaposvár | Core member | 2010-11-04 | 2020-10-14 |
| András Szabó | Doctoral School of Animal Science | Hungarian University of Agriculture and Life Sciences, Gödöllő*; University of Kaposvár | Core member | 2013-06-13 | 2020-10-14 |
| Zoltán Sütő | Doctoral School of Animal Science | University of Kaposvár | Core member | 2014-07-15 | 2019-04-11 |
| Tamás Gergely Molnár | Doctoral School of Animal Science | Hungarian University of Agriculture and Life Sciences, Gödöllő*; University of Kaposvár | Core member | 2019-04-11 | 2020-10-14 |
| József Lanszki | Doctoral School of Animal Science | Hungarian University of Agriculture and Life Sciences, Gödöllő*; University of Kaposvár | Core member | 2017-09-20 | 2020-10-14 |
| Gabriella Kazinczi | Doctoral School of Animal Science | Hungarian University of Agriculture and Life Sciences, Gödöllő*; University of Kaposvár | Core member | 2013-06-13 | 2014-07-15 |
| Vilmos Altbäcker | Doctoral School of Animal Science | Hungarian University of Agriculture and Life Sciences, Gödöllő*; University of Kaposvár | Core member | 2014-07-15 | 2020-10-14 |