| name | name of doctoral school | institution Teljes munkaidejű állás intézménye csillaggal jelölve és vastag betűvel kiemelve. | form of membership | starting date of membership | date of termination of membership |
---|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
| Aladár Nagy | Hantos Elemér Doctoral School of Business, Management and Regional Sciences | University of Miskolc* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2013-07-01 |
| Dezső Szakály | Hantos Elemér Doctoral School of Business, Management and Regional Sciences | University of Miskolc* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2016-06-30 |
| Gyula Fülöp | Hantos Elemér Doctoral School of Business, Management and Regional Sciences | University of Miskolc* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2016-06-30 |
| István Szintay | Hantos Elemér Doctoral School of Business, Management and Regional Sciences | University of Miskolc* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2014-02-20 |
| György Kocziszky | Hantos Elemér Doctoral School of Business, Management and Regional Sciences | University of Miskolc* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2019-11-27 |
| Mária Illés | Hantos Elemér Doctoral School of Business, Management and Regional Sciences | University of Miskolc* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2017-05-07 |
| Lajos Besenyei | Hantos Elemér Doctoral School of Business, Management and Regional Sciences | University of Miskolc* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2013-02-26 |
| Klára Tóthné Szita | Hantos Elemér Doctoral School of Business, Management and Regional Sciences | University of Miskolc | Core member | 2011-09-01 | 2016-06-30 |
| Károly Balaton | Hantos Elemér Doctoral School of Business, Management and Regional Sciences | University of Miskolc* | Core member | 2012-06-27 | 2013-02-19 |
| József Benedek | Hantos Elemér Doctoral School of Business, Management and Regional Sciences | University of Miskolc* | Core member | 2013-03-19 | 2019-11-27 |
| Levente Kovács | Hantos Elemér Doctoral School of Business, Management and Regional Sciences | University of Miskolc* | Core member | 2014-09-15 | 2015-02-13 |
| Levente Kovács | Hantos Elemér Doctoral School of Business, Management and Regional Sciences | University of Miskolc* | Core member | 2016-06-16 | 2017-04-13 |
| Tamás Sikos T. | Hantos Elemér Doctoral School of Business, Management and Regional Sciences | University of Miskolc* | Core member | 2017-09-20 | 2019-11-27 |