| name | name of doctoral school | institution Teljes munkaidejű állás intézménye csillaggal jelölve és vastag betűvel kiemelve. | form of membership | starting date of membership | date of termination of membership |
---|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
| Miklós Laczkovich | Doctoral School of Mathematics | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2018-02-22 |
| András Sárközy | Doctoral School of Mathematics | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2014-09-18 |
| György Michaletzky | Doctoral School of Mathematics | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2016-02-25 |
| Zoltán Sebestyén | Doctoral School of Mathematics | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2014-09-18 |
| László Simon | Doctoral School of Mathematics | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2014-09-18 |
| István Faragó | Doctoral School of Mathematics | Budapest University of Technology and Economics*; Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2019-02-28 |
| Alice Fialowski | Doctoral School of Mathematics | University of Pécs*; Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2014-04-30 |
| Róbert Fullér | Doctoral School of Mathematics | Széchenyi István University, Győr*; Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2011-08-31 |
| Tibor Illés | Doctoral School of Mathematics | Corvinus University of Budapest*; Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2014-09-30 |
| Tamás Móri | Doctoral School of Mathematics | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2019-03-07 |
| Péter Sziklai | Doctoral School of Mathematics | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2019-03-07 |
| Béla Vizvári | Doctoral School of Mathematics | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2014-09-30 |
| László Lovász | Doctoral School of Mathematics | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2018-10-24 |
| Károly ifj. Böröczky | Doctoral School of Mathematics | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2019-03-07 |
| András † Prékopa | Doctoral School of Mathematics | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2016-12-15 |
| Péter Pál Pálfy | Doctoral School of Mathematics | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2016-02-24 |
| Miklós Simonovits | Doctoral School of Mathematics | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2014-09-18 |
| Vera T. Sós | Doctoral School of Mathematics | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest | Core member | 2015-05-14 | 2015-07-12 |
| Gábor Tusnády | Doctoral School of Mathematics | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2014-09-18 |
| László Pyber | Doctoral School of Mathematics | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2019-03-07 |
| Imre Ruzsa | Doctoral School of Mathematics | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2014-09-30 |
| András Stipsicz | Doctoral School of Mathematics | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2014-09-30 |
| Hajnal Andréka | Doctoral School of Mathematics | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2017-11-17 |
| István Németi | Doctoral School of Mathematics | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2014-09-30 |
| Ákos Császár | Doctoral School of Mathematics | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2014-09-18 |
| András Gyárfás | Doctoral School of Mathematics | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2014-09-30 |
| János Szenthe | Doctoral School of Mathematics | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2014-09-18 |
| István Juhász | Doctoral School of Mathematics | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2014-09-18 |
| Csaba Csíkos | Doctoral School of Mathematics | University of Szeged*; Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest | Core member | 2018-03-08 | 2021-10-15 |