| name | name of doctoral school | institution Teljes munkaidejű állás intézménye csillaggal jelölve és vastag betűvel kiemelve. | form of membership | starting date of membership | date of termination of membership |
---|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
| Péter Balázs | Doctoral School of Economics | Central European University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2013-10-02 |
| Gerardo Della Paolera | Doctoral School of Economics | Central European University, Budapest* | Core member | 2009-03-19 | 2013-06-12 |
| John Earle | Doctoral School of Economics | Central European University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2014-09-24 |
| Béla Greskovits | Doctoral School of Economics | Central European University, Budapest* | Core member | 2014-07-16 | 2016-07-31 |
| Gábor Kézdi | Doctoral School of Economics | Central European University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2017-07-31 |
| Péter Kondor | Doctoral School of Economics | Central European University, Budapest* | Core member | 2012-08-27 | 2012-10-09 |
| Miklós Koren | Doctoral School of Economics | Central European University, Budapest* | Core member | 2012-08-27 | 2013-08-31 |
| Attila Rátfai | Doctoral School of Economics | Central European University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2013-08-31 |
| Ádám Szeidl | Doctoral School of Economics | Central European University, Budapest* | Core member | 2016-08-01 | 2023-07-01 |
| Ádám Szeidl | Doctoral School of Economics | Central European University, Budapest* | Core member | 2011-09-01 | 2013-09-09 |
| Andrea Weber | Doctoral School of Economics | Central European University, Budapest* | Core member | 2018-09-01 | 2022-07-31 |