| name | name of doctoral school | institution Teljes munkaidejű állás intézménye csillaggal jelölve és vastag betűvel kiemelve. | form of membership | starting date of membership | date of termination of membership |
---|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
| Tibor Farkas | Doctoral School of Military Engineering | Universitas Budensis*; National University of Public Service, Budapest | Core member | 2022-01-24 | 2024-02-19 |
| Zoltán Grósz | Doctoral School of Military Engineering | National University of Public Service, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2014-02-19 |
| László † Halász | Doctoral School of Military Engineering | National University of Public Service, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2015-06-03 |
| Júlia Hornyacsek | Doctoral School of Military Engineering | National University of Public Service, Budapest* | Core member | 2017-05-09 | 2022-01-24 |
| Júlia Hornyacsek | Doctoral School of Military Engineering | National University of Public Service, Budapest* | Core member | 2014-01-21 | 2015-06-03 |
| Attila Horváth | Doctoral School of Military Engineering | National University of Public Service, Budapest* | Core member | 2017-05-09 | 2024-07-01 |
| Attila Horváth | Doctoral School of Military Engineering | National University of Public Service, Budapest* | Core member | 2014-09-10 | 2015-06-03 |
| István Horváth | Doctoral School of Military Engineering | National University of Public Service, Budapest* | Core member | 2011-08-26 | 2013-01-14 |
| István Horváth | Doctoral School of Military Engineering | National University of Public Service, Budapest* | Core member | 2011-09-08 | 2013-08-27 |
| György Kende | Doctoral School of Military Engineering | National University of Public Service, Budapest | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2020-01-27 |
| László Kovács | Doctoral School of Military Engineering | National University of Public Service, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2019-12-16 |
| Zoltán Tibor Kovács | Doctoral School of Military Engineering | National University of Public Service, Budapest* | Core member | 2014-09-10 | 2015-06-03 |
| László Lukács | Doctoral School of Military Engineering | National University of Public Service, Budapest | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2013-08-27 |
| Lajos Muha | Doctoral School of Military Engineering | National University of Public Service, Budapest | Core member | 2013-03-26 | 2013-08-27 |
| Sándor Munk | Doctoral School of Military Engineering | National University of Public Service, Budapest* | Core member | 2014-01-21 | 2019-01-28 |
| Gyula Óvári | Doctoral School of Military Engineering | National University of Public Service, Budapest* | Core member | 2013-09-16 | 2014-09-10 |
| György Pátzay | Doctoral School of Military Engineering | National University of Public Service, Budapest* | Core member | 2016-02-04 | 2020-09-28 |
| Sándor Szabó | Doctoral School of Military Engineering | National University of Public Service, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2015-05-16 |
| Róbert Szabolcsi | Doctoral School of Military Engineering | Universitas Budensis*; National University of Public Service, Budapest | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2013-05-06 |
| Károly Turcsányi | Doctoral School of Military Engineering | National University of Public Service, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2015-06-03 |
| László Ványa | Doctoral School of Military Engineering | National University of Public Service, Budapest | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2019-01-28 |
| Gyula Vass | Doctoral School of Military Engineering | National University of Public Service, Budapest* | Core member | 2017-05-09 | 2022-12-12 |