Login
Forum
Organisation
officers
member institutions
resolutions (in Hung.)
by-laws (in Hung.)
regulations
Doctoral program
doctoral schools
by institution
by research field
by number
ceased working
academic staff member
by name
by research topic
archives
thesis topic proposals
by doctoral school
by research field
by research topic
supervision of PhD students
search students
Theses defended
by institution
by research field
by name
by date
by doctoral school
Naturalized degrees
by institution
by research field
by name
by date
Habilitation presentations
by institution
by branch of science
by name
Documents (all in Hung.)
public documents
news
legal backgrounds
guidelines
Contacts
contact details
partners
by name
by research topic
archives
archives
name or partial name of the academic staff member
identification number of the doctoral school
form of membership
all
Core member
earlier members
Export data in CSV format
Restore original arrangement
Results: 15 Visible: 1-15
name
name of doctoral school
institution
Teljes munkaidejű állás intézménye csillaggal jelölve és vastag betűvel kiemelve.
form of membership
starting date of membership
date of termination of membership
László Garbai
Géza Pattantyús-Ábrahám Doctoral School of Mechanical Engineering
Budapest University of Technology and Economics
Core member
2007-11-01
2013-06-30
János Somló
Géza Pattantyús-Ábrahám Doctoral School of Mechanical Engineering
Universitas Budensis*
; Budapest University of Technology and Economics
Core member
2007-11-01
2011-09-06
László Szabó
Géza Pattantyús-Ábrahám Doctoral School of Mechanical Engineering
Budapest University of Technology and Economics*
Core member
2007-11-01
2013-06-30
Gábor Halász
Géza Pattantyús-Ábrahám Doctoral School of Mechanical Engineering
Budapest University of Technology and Economics*
Core member
2007-11-01
2013-06-30
Tibor Czvikovszky
Géza Pattantyús-Ábrahám Doctoral School of Mechanical Engineering
Budapest University of Technology and Economics*
Core member
2007-11-01
2013-06-30
János Ginsztler
Géza Pattantyús-Ábrahám Doctoral School of Mechanical Engineering
Budapest University of Technology and Economics*
Core member
2007-11-01
2019-04-27
Attila Meggyes
Géza Pattantyús-Ábrahám Doctoral School of Mechanical Engineering
Budapest University of Technology and Economics
Core member
2007-11-01
2011-03-28
Mihály Kozma
Géza Pattantyús-Ábrahám Doctoral School of Mechanical Engineering
Budapest University of Technology and Economics*
Core member
2007-11-01
2013-06-30
Antal Penninger
Géza Pattantyús-Ábrahám Doctoral School of Mechanical Engineering
Budapest University of Technology and Economics
Core member
2007-11-01
2013-06-30
J. István Jóri
Géza Pattantyús-Ábrahám Doctoral School of Mechanical Engineering
Budapest University of Technology and Economics
Core member
2007-11-01
2013-06-30
Tamás Lajos
Géza Pattantyús-Ábrahám Doctoral School of Mechanical Engineering
Budapest University of Technology and Economics
Core member
2007-11-01
2013-06-30
Károly Váradi
Géza Pattantyús-Ábrahám Doctoral School of Mechanical Engineering
Budapest University of Technology and Economics*
Core member
2007-11-01
2019-06-27
György Ábrahám
Géza Pattantyús-Ábrahám Doctoral School of Mechanical Engineering
Budapest University of Technology and Economics*
Core member
2007-11-01
2016-11-06
Mátyás Horváth
Géza Pattantyús-Ábrahám Doctoral School of Mechanical Engineering
Budapest University of Technology and Economics*
Core member
2007-11-01
2011-09-29
Péter Korondi
Géza Pattantyús-Ábrahám Doctoral School of Mechanical Engineering
University of Debrecen*
; Budapest University of Technology and Economics
Core member
2009-02-16
2021-10-28
Export data in CSV format
Restore original arrangement
Results: 15 Visible: 1-15
All rights reserved © 2007, Hungarian Doctoral Council. Doctoral Council registration number at commissioner for data protection: 02003/0001. Program version: 2.2358 ( 2017. X. 31. )