| name | name of doctoral school | institution Teljes munkaidejű állás intézménye csillaggal jelölve és vastag betűvel kiemelve. | form of membership | starting date of membership | date of termination of membership |
---|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
| György Szternák | Doctoral School of Military Sciences | National University of Public Service, Budapest | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2013-06-25 |
| Ildikó Szelei | Doctoral School of Military Sciences | National University of Public Service, Budapest* | Core member | 2013-08-01 | 2014-01-01 |
| Ildikó Szelei | Doctoral School of Military Sciences | National University of Public Service, Budapest* | Core member | 2013-06-19 | 2013-08-27 |
| Miklós Szabó | Doctoral School of Military Sciences | National University of Public Service, Budapest* | Core member | 2019-01-07 | 2021-04-28 |
| Miklós Szabó | Doctoral School of Military Sciences | National University of Public Service, Budapest* | Core member | 2013-08-31 | 2018-08-31 |
| Miklós Szabó | Doctoral School of Military Sciences | National University of Public Service, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2013-08-05 |
| Ferenc Szabó A. | Doctoral School of Military Sciences | National University of Public Service, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2015-03-19 |
| István Resperger | Doctoral School of Military Sciences | Hungarian University of Agriculture and Life Sciences, Gödöllő*; National University of Public Service, Budapest | Core member | 2013-02-13 | 2023-05-01 |
| Zoltán Rajnai | Doctoral School of Military Sciences | Universitas Budensis*; National University of Public Service, Budapest | Core member | 2011-09-26 | 2011-10-01 |
| Zoltán Rajnai | Doctoral School of Military Sciences | Universitas Budensis*; National University of Public Service, Budapest | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2011-01-31 |
| Sándor Munk | Doctoral School of Military Sciences | National University of Public Service, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2014-01-22 |
| Ferenc Molnár | Doctoral School of Military Sciences | National University of Public Service, Budapest | Core member | 2011-09-26 | 2011-12-02 |
| Zoltán Krajnc | Doctoral School of Military Sciences | National University of Public Service, Budapest* | Core member | 2011-09-26 | 2011-12-02 |
| Zoltán Krajnc | Doctoral School of Military Sciences | National University of Public Service, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2011-01-31 |
| Csaba Horváth | Doctoral School of Military Sciences | Károli Gáspár University of the Reformed Church, Budapest*; National University of Public Service, Budapest | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2013-06-25 |
| Dénes Harai | Doctoral School of Military Sciences | National University of Public Service, Budapest* | Core member | 2013-09-20 | 2022-01-10 |
| Dénes Harai | Doctoral School of Military Sciences | National University of Public Service, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2011-01-31 |
| Ferenc Gazdag | Doctoral School of Military Sciences | National University of Public Service, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2018-03-05 |
| Tamás Csikány | Doctoral School of Military Sciences | National University of Public Service, Budapest | Core member | 2020-01-28 | 2023-06-15 |
| Tamás Csikány | Doctoral School of Military Sciences | National University of Public Service, Budapest | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2018-08-31 |
| Judit Bolgár | Doctoral School of Military Sciences | National University of Public Service, Budapest* | Core member | 2013-12-01 | 2014-08-05 |
| Judit Bolgár | Doctoral School of Military Sciences | National University of Public Service, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2011-01-31 |