Login
Forum
Organisation
officers
member institutions
resolutions (in Hung.)
by-laws (in Hung.)
regulations
Doctoral program
doctoral schools
by institution
by research field
by number
ceased working
academic staff member
by name
by research topic
archives
thesis topic proposals
by doctoral school
by research field
by research topic
supervision of PhD students
search students
Theses defended
by institution
by research field
by name
by date
by doctoral school
Naturalized degrees
by institution
by research field
by name
by date
Habilitation presentations
by institution
by branch of science
by name
Documents (all in Hung.)
public documents
news
legal backgrounds
guidelines
Contacts
contact details
partners
by name
by research topic
archives
archives
name or partial name of the academic staff member
identification number of the doctoral school
form of membership
all
Core member
earlier members
Export data in CSV format
Restore original arrangement
Results: 24 Visible: 1-24
name
name of doctoral school
institution
Teljes munkaidejű állás intézménye csillaggal jelölve és vastag betűvel kiemelve.
form of membership
starting date of membership
date of termination of membership
Károly Balaton
Doctoral School of Business and Management
University of Miskolc*
; Corvinus University of Budapest
Core member
2007-11-01
2011-01-31
Attila Chikán
Doctoral School of Business and Management
Corvinus University of Budapest*
Core member
2007-11-01
2017-04-09
Csaba Csáki
Doctoral School of Business and Management
Corvinus University of Budapest*
Core member
2007-11-01
2016-02-24
Miklós Dobák
Doctoral School of Business and Management
Corvinus University of Budapest*
Core member
2007-11-01
2021-02-25
Mihály Gálik
Doctoral School of Business and Management
Corvinus University of Budapest*
Core member
2007-11-01
2010-12-08
Sándor Kerekes
Doctoral School of Business and Management
Corvinus University of Budapest*
Core member
2007-11-01
2013-06-26
József Kindler
Doctoral School of Business and Management
Corvinus University of Budapest*
Core member
2007-11-01
2010-12-31
József Berács
Doctoral School of Business and Management
Corvinus University of Budapest*
Core member
2007-11-01
2014-07-31
Tamás Mészáros
Doctoral School of Business and Management
Corvinus University of Budapest*
Core member
2007-11-01
2016-09-06
Edina Berlinger
Doctoral School of Business and Management
Corvinus University of Budapest*
Core member
2020-06-02
2023-05-18
Krisztina Városiné Demeter
Doctoral School of Business and Management
Corvinus University of Budapest*
Core member
2013-07-03
2017-12-31
Gyula Bakacsi
Doctoral School of Business and Management
Budapest Business University*
; Corvinus University of Budapest
Core member
2011-02-22
2013-07-22
Gyula Bakacsi
Doctoral School of Business and Management
Budapest Business University*
; Corvinus University of Budapest
Core member
2013-09-02
2013-09-23
Judit Simon
Doctoral School of Business and Management
Corvinus University of Budapest*
Core member
2013-07-03
2021-03-07
Erzsébet Czakó
Doctoral School of Business and Management
Budapest Business University*
; Corvinus University of Budapest
Core member
2011-01-22
2023-02-06
András Bauer
Doctoral School of Business and Management
Corvinus University of Budapest*
Core member
2016-02-11
2021-01-26
Zsuzsanna Marjainé Szerényi
Doctoral School of Business and Management
Corvinus University of Budapest*
Core member
2011-02-22
2011-12-15
László Gulácsi
Doctoral School of Business and Management
Universitas Budensis*
; Corvinus University of Budapest
Core member
2013-07-25
2020-07-01
József Tóth
Doctoral School of Business and Management
Corvinus University of Budapest*
Core member
2013-07-03
2015-06-18
Henriett Primecz
Doctoral School of Business and Management
Corvinus University of Budapest*
Core member
2020-06-02
2021-02-08
Imre Fertő
Doctoral School of Business and Management
Corvinus University of Budapest*
Core member
2010-12-16
2015-02-19
Márta Péntek
Doctoral School of Business and Management
Universitas Budensis*
; Corvinus University of Budapest
Core member
2018-03-14
2020-06-02
György Pataki
Doctoral School of Business and Management
Corvinus University of Budapest
Core member
2017-10-11
2020-04-01
Gábor Michalkó
Doctoral School of Business and Management
University of Pannonia*
; Corvinus University of Budapest
Core member
2014-03-26
2023-03-16
Export data in CSV format
Restore original arrangement
Results: 24 Visible: 1-24
All rights reserved © 2007, Hungarian Doctoral Council. Doctoral Council registration number at commissioner for data protection: 02003/0001. Program version: 2.2358 ( 2017. X. 31. )