| name | name of doctoral school | institution Teljes munkaidejű állás intézménye csillaggal jelölve és vastag betűvel kiemelve. | form of membership | starting date of membership | date of termination of membership |
---|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
| András Zwickl | Doctoral School of Moholy-Nagy Univerity of Art and Design Budapest | Moholy-Nagy University of Art and Design, Budapest* | Core member | 2023-06-30 | 2023-07-18 |
| András Zwickl | Doctoral School of Moholy-Nagy Univerity of Art and Design Budapest | Moholy-Nagy University of Art and Design, Budapest* | Core member | 2023-02-28 | 2023-05-01 |
| Bálint Veres | Doctoral School of Moholy-Nagy Univerity of Art and Design Budapest | Moholy-Nagy University of Art and Design, Budapest* | Core member | 2023-02-28 | 2023-05-01 |
| András Göde | Doctoral School of Moholy-Nagy Univerity of Art and Design Budapest | Moholy-Nagy University of Art and Design, Budapest* | Core member | 2023-02-28 | 2023-05-22 |
| Balázs Vargha | Doctoral School of Moholy-Nagy Univerity of Art and Design Budapest | Moholy-Nagy University of Art and Design, Budapest* | Core member | 2023-02-28 | 2023-05-22 |
| Csaba Kovács | Doctoral School of Moholy-Nagy Univerity of Art and Design Budapest | Moholy-Nagy University of Art and Design, Budapest* | Core member | 2023-02-28 | 2023-05-22 |
| Tamás Getto | Doctoral School of Moholy-Nagy Univerity of Art and Design Budapest | Moholy-Nagy University of Art and Design, Budapest* | Core member | 2023-02-28 | 2023-05-22 |
| Tamás Getto | Doctoral School of Moholy-Nagy Univerity of Art and Design Budapest | Moholy-Nagy University of Art and Design, Budapest* | Core member | 2018-10-03 | 2020-12-15 |
| András Göde | Doctoral School of Moholy-Nagy Univerity of Art and Design Budapest | Moholy-Nagy University of Art and Design, Budapest* | Core member | 2017-05-23 | 2020-12-15 |
| Márton Szentpéteri | Doctoral School of Moholy-Nagy Univerity of Art and Design Budapest | Moholy-Nagy University of Art and Design, Budapest* | Core member | 2017-05-23 | 2017-09-28 |
| András Ferkai | Doctoral School of Moholy-Nagy Univerity of Art and Design Budapest | Moholy-Nagy University of Art and Design, Budapest* | Core member | 2016-11-11 | 2019-11-15 |
| Ágnes Kapitány | Doctoral School of Moholy-Nagy Univerity of Art and Design Budapest | Moholy-Nagy University of Art and Design, Budapest* | Core member | 2016-11-11 | 2019-11-15 |
| László Zsótér | Doctoral School of Moholy-Nagy Univerity of Art and Design Budapest | Moholy-Nagy University of Art and Design, Budapest* | Core member | 2014-11-01 | 2017-09-28 |
| Gyula Ernyey | Doctoral School of Moholy-Nagy Univerity of Art and Design Budapest | Moholy-Nagy University of Art and Design, Budapest* | Core member | 2014-09-21 | 2017-09-28 |
| Mária István | Doctoral School of Moholy-Nagy Univerity of Art and Design Budapest | Moholy-Nagy University of Art and Design, Budapest | Core member | 2014-09-20 | 2014-12-31 |
| Miklós Gulyás | Doctoral School of Moholy-Nagy Univerity of Art and Design Budapest | Moholy-Nagy University of Art and Design, Budapest* | Core member | 2014-07-09 | 2023-02-28 |
| András Bánfalvi | Doctoral School of Moholy-Nagy Univerity of Art and Design Budapest | Moholy-Nagy University of Art and Design, Budapest* | Core member | 2014-01-01 | 2014-05-30 |
| András Ferkai | Doctoral School of Moholy-Nagy Univerity of Art and Design Budapest | Moholy-Nagy University of Art and Design, Budapest* | Core member | 2013-10-01 | 2016-11-11 |
| Mária István | Doctoral School of Moholy-Nagy Univerity of Art and Design Budapest | Moholy-Nagy University of Art and Design, Budapest | Core member | 2013-10-01 | 2014-09-20 |
| Anna Pauli | Doctoral School of Moholy-Nagy Univerity of Art and Design Budapest | Moholy-Nagy University of Art and Design, Budapest | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2013-05-30 |
| Tamás Nagy | Doctoral School of Moholy-Nagy Univerity of Art and Design Budapest | Moholy-Nagy University of Art and Design, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2020-09-08 |
| András Ferkai | Doctoral School of Moholy-Nagy Univerity of Art and Design Budapest | Moholy-Nagy University of Art and Design, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2013-09-30 |
| Judit Droppa | Doctoral School of Moholy-Nagy Univerity of Art and Design Budapest | Moholy-Nagy University of Art and Design, Budapest | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2013-05-30 |
| László Zsótér | Doctoral School of Moholy-Nagy Univerity of Art and Design Budapest | Moholy-Nagy University of Art and Design, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2014-10-31 |
| Attila Bárkányi | Doctoral School of Moholy-Nagy Univerity of Art and Design Budapest | Moholy-Nagy University of Art and Design, Budapest | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2013-05-31 |
| Gábor Turányi | Doctoral School of Moholy-Nagy Univerity of Art and Design Budapest | Moholy-Nagy University of Art and Design, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2016-11-15 |
| Mária István | Doctoral School of Moholy-Nagy Univerity of Art and Design Budapest | Moholy-Nagy University of Art and Design, Budapest | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2013-09-30 |
| István Ferencz | Doctoral School of Moholy-Nagy Univerity of Art and Design Budapest | Moholy-Nagy University of Art and Design, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2017-09-28 |
| Vladimír Péter | Doctoral School of Moholy-Nagy Univerity of Art and Design Budapest | Moholy-Nagy University of Art and Design, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2017-09-28 |
| József Scherer | Doctoral School of Moholy-Nagy Univerity of Art and Design Budapest | Moholy-Nagy University of Art and Design, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2017-09-26 |
| Gyula Molnár | Doctoral School of Moholy-Nagy Univerity of Art and Design Budapest | Moholy-Nagy University of Art and Design, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2013-04-09 |
| Gyula Ernyey | Doctoral School of Moholy-Nagy Univerity of Art and Design Budapest | Moholy-Nagy University of Art and Design, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2014-09-20 |
| József Tillmann | Doctoral School of Moholy-Nagy Univerity of Art and Design Budapest | Moholy-Nagy University of Art and Design, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2013-09-30 |