Login
Forum
Organisation
officers
member institutions
resolutions (in Hung.)
by-laws (in Hung.)
regulations
Doctoral program
doctoral schools
by institution
by research field
by number
ceased working
academic staff member
by name
by research topic
archives
thesis topic proposals
by doctoral school
by research field
by research topic
supervision of PhD students
search students
Theses defended
by institution
by research field
by name
by date
by doctoral school
Naturalized degrees
by institution
by research field
by name
by date
Habilitation presentations
by institution
by branch of science
by name
Documents (all in Hung.)
public documents
news
legal backgrounds
guidelines
Contacts
contact details
partners
by name
by research topic
archives
archives
name or partial name of the academic staff member
identification number of the doctoral school
form of membership
all
Core member
earlier members
Export data in CSV format
Restore original arrangement
Results: 15 Visible: 1-15
name
name of doctoral school
institution
Teljes munkaidejű állás intézménye csillaggal jelölve és vastag betűvel kiemelve.
form of membership
starting date of membership
date of termination of membership
József Tóth
Doctoral School of Earth Sciences
University of Pécs*
Core member
2007-11-01
2013-02-01
Zoltán Dövényi
Doctoral School of Earth Sciences
University of Pécs*
Core member
2007-11-01
2018-10-28
Antal Aubert
Doctoral School of Earth Sciences
University of Pécs*
Core member
2007-11-01
2011-02-11
Antal Aubert
Doctoral School of Earth Sciences
University of Pécs*
Core member
2013-09-20
2021-01-31
Gyula Konrád
Doctoral School of Earth Sciences
University of Pécs*
Core member
2013-09-20
2015-02-24
Norbert Pap
Doctoral School of Earth Sciences
University of Pécs*
Core member
2007-11-01
2011-02-11
Róbert Tésits
Doctoral School of Earth Sciences
University of Pécs*
Core member
2007-11-01
2011-02-11
Zoltán Wilhelm
Doctoral School of Earth Sciences
University of Pécs*
Core member
2007-11-01
2011-02-11
Ferenc Schweitzer
Doctoral School of Earth Sciences
University of Pécs*
Core member
2007-11-01
2014-09-29
István Geresdi
Doctoral School of Earth Sciences
University of Pécs*
Core member
2007-11-01
2015-10-28
László Nagyváradi
Doctoral School of Earth Sciences
University of Pécs*
Core member
2007-11-01
2011-02-11
László Bozó
Doctoral School of Earth Sciences
Hungarian University of Agriculture and Life Sciences, Gödöllő*
; University of Pécs
Core member
2009-07-08
2011-08-31
István Szilágyi
Doctoral School of Earth Sciences
University of Pécs
Core member
2010-08-19
2020-01-20
Márta Polgári
Doctoral School of Earth Sciences
University of Pécs
Core member
2011-09-01
2011-12-31
Márta Polgári
Doctoral School of Earth Sciences
University of Pécs
Core member
2013-12-13
2022-09-01
Export data in CSV format
Restore original arrangement
Results: 15 Visible: 1-15
All rights reserved © 2007, Hungarian Doctoral Council. Doctoral Council registration number at commissioner for data protection: 02003/0001. Program version: 2.2358 ( 2017. X. 31. )