Login
Forum
Organisation
officers
member institutions
resolutions (in Hung.)
by-laws (in Hung.)
regulations
Doctoral program
doctoral schools
by institution
by research field
by number
ceased working
academic staff member
by name
by research topic
archives
thesis topic proposals
by doctoral school
by research field
by research topic
supervision of PhD students
search students
Theses defended
by institution
by research field
by name
by date
by doctoral school
Naturalized degrees
by institution
by research field
by name
by date
Habilitation presentations
by institution
by branch of science
by name
Documents (all in Hung.)
public documents
news
legal backgrounds
guidelines
Contacts
contact details
partners
by name
by research topic
archives
archives
name or partial name of the academic staff member
identification number of the doctoral school
form of membership
all
Core member
earlier members
Export data in CSV format
Restore original arrangement
Results: 27 Visible: 1-27
name
name of doctoral school
institution
Teljes munkaidejű állás intézménye csillaggal jelölve és vastag betűvel kiemelve.
form of membership
starting date of membership
date of termination of membership
Sándor Antus
Doctoral School of Chemistry
University of Debrecen*
Core member
2007-11-01
2015-09-21
István Bányai
Doctoral School of Chemistry
University of Debrecen*
Core member
2007-11-01
2023-09-03
György Bazsa
Doctoral School of Chemistry
University of Debrecen
Core member
2007-11-01
2014-10-05
Anikó Borbás
Doctoral School of Chemistry
University of Debrecen*
Core member
2007-11-01
2013-09-10
Ernő Brücher
Doctoral School of Chemistry
University of Debrecen*
Core member
2007-11-01
2013-09-16
Etelka Farkas
Doctoral School of Chemistry
University of Debrecen*
Core member
2007-11-01
2015-09-21
Vilmos Gáspár
Doctoral School of Chemistry
University of Debrecen
Core member
2007-11-01
2017-02-07
Ferenc Joó
Doctoral School of Chemistry
University of Debrecen*
Core member
2007-11-01
2019-01-09
Ferenc Joó
Doctoral School of Chemistry
University of Debrecen*
Core member
2007-11-01
2019-01-08
Ágnes Kathó
Doctoral School of Chemistry
University of Debrecen*
Core member
2007-11-01
2018-04-15
Katalin Kövér
Doctoral School of Chemistry
University of Debrecen*
Core member
2007-11-01
2023-04-20
Gábor Lente
Doctoral School of Chemistry
University of Pécs*
; University of Debrecen
Core member
2007-11-01
2013-09-10
András (1935-2012) Lipták
Doctoral School of Chemistry
University of Debrecen*
Core member
2007-11-01
2011-09-12
Károly Micskei
Doctoral School of Chemistry
University of Debrecen*
Core member
2007-11-01
2012-03-15
István Nagy
Doctoral School of Chemistry
University of Debrecen*
Core member
2007-11-01
2011-02-14
István Nagy
Doctoral School of Chemistry
University of Debrecen*
Core member
2011-08-31
2012-02-14
Katalin Ősz
Doctoral School of Chemistry
University of Pécs*
; University of Debrecen
Core member
2015-03-02
2018-02-12
Tamás (1951-2015) Patonay
Doctoral School of Chemistry
University of Debrecen*
Core member
2007-11-01
2015-06-23
Gyula Rábai
Doctoral School of Chemistry
University of Debrecen*
Core member
2007-11-01
2014-09-18
Gyula Rábai
Doctoral School of Chemistry
University of Debrecen*
Core member
2007-11-01
2014-09-01
Gyula Rábai
Doctoral School of Chemistry
University of Debrecen*
Core member
2007-11-01
2014-10-05
László Somsák
Doctoral School of Chemistry
University of Debrecen*
Core member
2007-11-01
2023-09-03
Imre Sóvágó
Doctoral School of Chemistry
University of Debrecen*
Core member
2007-11-01
2014-04-08
László Szilágyi
Doctoral School of Chemistry
University of Debrecen*
Core member
2007-11-01
2013-09-16
Imre Tóth
Doctoral School of Chemistry
University of Debrecen*
Core member
2007-11-01
2015-09-21
Zoltán Tóth
Doctoral School of Chemistry
University of Debrecen
Core member
2007-11-01
2011-08-31
Miklós Zsuga
Doctoral School of Chemistry
University of Debrecen*
Core member
2007-11-01
2015-09-21
Export data in CSV format
Restore original arrangement
Results: 27 Visible: 1-27
All rights reserved © 2007, Hungarian Doctoral Council. Doctoral Council registration number at commissioner for data protection: 02003/0001. Program version: 2.2358 ( 2017. X. 31. )