| name | name of doctoral school | institution Teljes munkaidejű állás intézménye csillaggal jelölve és vastag betűvel kiemelve. | form of membership | starting date of membership | date of termination of membership |
---|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
| Klára Abaffyné Dózsa-Farkas | Doctoral School of Biology | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2010-11-07 |
| Klára Abaffyné Dózsa-Farkas | Doctoral School of Biology | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2012-05-22 | 2015-09-29 |
| Vilmos Altbäcker | Doctoral School of Biology | Hungarian University of Agriculture and Life Sciences, Gödöllő*; Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2014-07-10 |
| Zsuzsa Bajtay | Doctoral School of Biology | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2013-07-15 | 2023-03-09 |
| Ervin Balázs | Doctoral School of Biology | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2019-04-11 |
| Béla Böddi | Doctoral School of Biology | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2013-04-22 |
| Tamás Czárán | Doctoral School of Biology | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest | Core member | 2015-03-19 | 2015-09-29 |
| László Détári | Doctoral School of Biology | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2023-11-06 | 2023-11-12 |
| László Détári | Doctoral School of Biology | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2014-09-30 |
| Anna Erdei | Doctoral School of Biology | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2023-05-09 |
| László Gráf | Doctoral School of Biology | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2023-04-04 |
| Gyula Gyenis | Doctoral School of Biology | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2010-10-23 |
| István (1935-2009) Gyurján | Doctoral School of Biology | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2009-12-24 |
| Gábor Herczeg | Doctoral School of Biology | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2014-05-13 | 2015-09-30 |
| Gábor (ELTE BI-PCs) Juhász | Doctoral School of Biology | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2014-09-30 |
| Attila Lajos Kovács | Doctoral School of Biology | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2009-02-01 |
| János Kovács | Doctoral School of Biology | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2015-09-29 |
| Károly Márialigeti | Doctoral School of Biology | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2023-11-12 |
| János Matkó | Doctoral School of Biology | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2019-11-21 |
| Géza Meszéna | Doctoral School of Biology | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2020-01-01 |
| Csaba Moskát | Doctoral School of Biology | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2020-04-15 |
| László Orosz | Doctoral School of Biology | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2014-09-30 |
| Judit Ovádi | Doctoral School of Biology | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2014-09-30 |
| László Patthy | Doctoral School of Biology | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2014-09-30 |
| János Podani | Doctoral School of Biology | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2023-05-09 |
| Péter Pongrácz | Doctoral School of Biology | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2013-07-15 | 2015-09-30 |
| Gabriella Sármay | Doctoral School of Biology | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2018-09-27 |
| Miklós Sass | Doctoral School of Biology | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2017-08-27 |
| Eörs Szathmáry | Doctoral School of Biology | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2014-09-30 |
| Zoltán Szigeti | Doctoral School of Biology | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2018-01-03 |
| László Tamás | Doctoral School of Biology | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2013-07-15 | 2023-03-09 |
| János Török | Doctoral School of Biology | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2024-05-09 |
| Miklós Tóth | Doctoral School of Biology | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2016-03-30 |
| Krisztina Vellainé Takács | Doctoral School of Biology | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2013-07-15 | 2015-09-30 |
| Ildikó Világi | Doctoral School of Biology | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2019-11-20 |