| name | name of doctoral school | institution Teljes munkaidejű állás intézménye csillaggal jelölve és vastag betűvel kiemelve. | form of membership | starting date of membership | date of termination of membership |
---|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
| Péter Nyitrai | Postgraduate Doctoral School of Law and Political Sciences | Széchenyi István University, Győr* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2008-03-28 |
| András Patyi | Postgraduate Doctoral School of Law and Political Sciences | National University of Public Service, Budapest*; Széchenyi István University, Győr | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2011-12-31 |
| Mihály Révész T. | Postgraduate Doctoral School of Law and Political Sciences | Széchenyi István University, Győr* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2008-03-28 |
| Péter Smuk | Postgraduate Doctoral School of Law and Political Sciences | Széchenyi István University, Győr* | Core member | 2014-09-15 | 2020-01-26 |
| István Stumpf | Postgraduate Doctoral School of Law and Political Sciences | Széchenyi István University, Győr* | Core member | 2015-09-01 | 2015-09-28 |
| Gábor Sulyok | Postgraduate Doctoral School of Law and Political Sciences | Széchenyi István University, Győr* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2013-09-27 |
| Gyula Szalay | Postgraduate Doctoral School of Law and Political Sciences | Széchenyi István University, Győr* | Core member | 2013-09-27 | 2013-10-28 |
| Zoltán Zsolt Szente | Postgraduate Doctoral School of Law and Political Sciences | National University of Public Service, Budapest*; Széchenyi István University, Győr | Core member | 2011-05-18 | 2013-08-31 |
| Péter Szigeti | Postgraduate Doctoral School of Law and Political Sciences | Széchenyi István University, Győr* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2021-09-30 |
| István Vavró | Postgraduate Doctoral School of Law and Political Sciences | Széchenyi István University, Győr* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2015-09-28 |