| name | name of doctoral school | institution Teljes munkaidejű állás intézménye csillaggal jelölve és vastag betűvel kiemelve. | form of membership | starting date of membership | date of termination of membership |
---|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
| Péter Budai | Doctoral School of Animal- and Agricultural Environmental Sciences | Hungarian University of Agriculture and Life Sciences, Gödöllő*; University of Pannonia | Core member | 2013-07-12 | 2014-07-01 |
| Péter Budai | Doctoral School of Animal- and Agricultural Environmental Sciences | Hungarian University of Agriculture and Life Sciences, Gödöllő*; University of Pannonia | Core member | 2014-07-01 | 2015-04-14 |
| Angéla Anda | Doctoral School of Animal- and Agricultural Environmental Sciences | Hungarian University of Agriculture and Life Sciences, Gödöllő*; University of Pannonia | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2015-04-14 |
| Gyula Sáringer | Doctoral School of Animal- and Agricultural Environmental Sciences | University of Pannonia | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2009-03-12 |
| Tibor Tóth | Doctoral School of Animal- and Agricultural Environmental Sciences | University of Pannonia | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2014-09-26 |
| Előd Kondorosy | Doctoral School of Animal- and Agricultural Environmental Sciences | Hungarian University of Agriculture and Life Sciences, Gödöllő*; University of Pannonia | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2015-04-14 |
| József Péter Polgár | Doctoral School of Animal- and Agricultural Environmental Sciences | Hungarian University of Agriculture and Life Sciences, Gödöllő*; University of Pannonia | Core member | 2013-07-12 | 2015-04-14 |
| Hedvig Fébel | Doctoral School of Animal- and Agricultural Environmental Sciences | University of Veterinary Medicine Budapest*; University of Pannonia | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2013-07-12 |
| Csaba Székely | Doctoral School of Animal- and Agricultural Environmental Sciences | University of Pannonia | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2013-07-12 |
| Ferenc Szabó | Doctoral School of Animal- and Agricultural Environmental Sciences | Széchenyi István University, Győr*; University of Pannonia | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2011-07-31 |
| Károly Dublecz | Doctoral School of Animal- and Agricultural Environmental Sciences | Hungarian University of Agriculture and Life Sciences, Gödöllő*; University of Pannonia | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2015-04-14 |
| Imre Béres | Doctoral School of Animal- and Agricultural Environmental Sciences | University of Pannonia | Core member | 2013-07-12 | 2013-08-25 |
| Borbála Biró | Doctoral School of Animal- and Agricultural Environmental Sciences | University of Pannonia | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2013-07-12 |
| Miklós Bercsényi | Doctoral School of Animal- and Agricultural Environmental Sciences | University of Pannonia* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2015-04-14 |
| Ferenc Husvéth | Doctoral School of Animal- and Agricultural Environmental Sciences | University of Pannonia* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2015-04-14 |
| Szabolcs Nagy | Doctoral School of Animal- and Agricultural Environmental Sciences | Hungarian University of Agriculture and Life Sciences, Gödöllő*; University of Pannonia | Core member | 2014-07-01 | 2015-04-14 |
| Szabolcs Bene | Doctoral School of Animal- and Agricultural Environmental Sciences | Hungarian University of Agriculture and Life Sciences, Gödöllő*; University of Pannonia | Core member | 2014-07-01 | 2015-02-25 |
| Zoltán Botta-Dukát | Doctoral School of Animal- and Agricultural Environmental Sciences | University of Pannonia | Core member | 2013-07-12 | 2014-09-08 |
| Zoltán Botta-Dukát | Doctoral School of Animal- and Agricultural Environmental Sciences | University of Pannonia | Core member | 2014-01-01 | 2015-04-14 |
| Gábor Galiba | Doctoral School of Animal- and Agricultural Environmental Sciences | Hungarian University of Agriculture and Life Sciences, Gödöllő*; University of Pannonia | Core member | 2013-08-22 | 2015-04-14 |