| name | name of doctoral school | institution Teljes munkaidejű állás intézménye csillaggal jelölve és vastag betűvel kiemelve. | form of membership | starting date of membership | date of termination of membership |
---|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
| Tamás Staller | THE DOCTORAL SCHOOL OF JEWISH RELIGIOUS STUDIES | Jewish Theological Seminary – University of Jewish Studies, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2012-10-13 |
| Alfréd Schőner | THE DOCTORAL SCHOOL OF JEWISH RELIGIOUS STUDIES | Jewish Theological Seminary – University of Jewish Studies, Budapest | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2018-11-14 |
| György Haraszti | THE DOCTORAL SCHOOL OF JEWISH RELIGIOUS STUDIES | Jewish Theological Seminary – University of Jewish Studies, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2022-02-08 |
| Endre Kiss | THE DOCTORAL SCHOOL OF JEWISH RELIGIOUS STUDIES | Jewish Theological Seminary – University of Jewish Studies, Budapest | Core member | 2013-07-30 | 2017-08-30 |
| Tamás Lichtmann | THE DOCTORAL SCHOOL OF JEWISH RELIGIOUS STUDIES | Jewish Theological Seminary – University of Jewish Studies, Budapest | Core member | 2012-01-01 | 2019-08-28 |
| György Gábor | THE DOCTORAL SCHOOL OF JEWISH RELIGIOUS STUDIES | Jewish Theological Seminary – University of Jewish Studies, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2011-10-31 |
| György Gábor | THE DOCTORAL SCHOOL OF JEWISH RELIGIOUS STUDIES | Jewish Theological Seminary – University of Jewish Studies, Budapest* | Core member | 2011-02-10 | 2011-10-31 |
| Iván Uhrman | THE DOCTORAL SCHOOL OF JEWISH RELIGIOUS STUDIES | Jewish Theological Seminary – University of Jewish Studies, Budapest* | Core member | 2012-10-29 | 2013-07-30 |
| Iván Uhrman | THE DOCTORAL SCHOOL OF JEWISH RELIGIOUS STUDIES | Jewish Theological Seminary – University of Jewish Studies, Budapest* | Core member | 2014-06-27 | 2024-02-28 |
| Judit Frigyesi | THE DOCTORAL SCHOOL OF JEWISH RELIGIOUS STUDIES | Jewish Theological Seminary – University of Jewish Studies, Budapest* | Core member | 2014-06-27 | 2019-04-11 |
| János Oláh | THE DOCTORAL SCHOOL OF JEWISH RELIGIOUS STUDIES | Jewish Theological Seminary – University of Jewish Studies, Budapest* | Core member | 2009-03-02 | 2020-10-04 |
| Tamás Ungvári | THE DOCTORAL SCHOOL OF JEWISH RELIGIOUS STUDIES | Jewish Theological Seminary – University of Jewish Studies, Budapest* | Core member | 2009-03-02 | 2013-07-30 |
| Károly Vajda | THE DOCTORAL SCHOOL OF JEWISH RELIGIOUS STUDIES | Jewish Theological Seminary – University of Jewish Studies, Budapest* | Core member | 2019-04-14 | 2022-09-01 |
| Károly Vajda | THE DOCTORAL SCHOOL OF JEWISH RELIGIOUS STUDIES | Jewish Theological Seminary – University of Jewish Studies, Budapest* | Core member | 2022-01-07 | 2022-09-01 |
| Tamás Bíró | THE DOCTORAL SCHOOL OF JEWISH RELIGIOUS STUDIES | Jewish Theological Seminary – University of Jewish Studies, Budapest* | Core member | 2022-01-07 | 2022-01-28 |
| Jutta Hausmann | THE DOCTORAL SCHOOL OF JEWISH RELIGIOUS STUDIES | Jewish Theological Seminary – University of Jewish Studies, Budapest* | Core member | 2019-03-04 | 2019-04-04 |