| name | name of doctoral school | institution Teljes munkaidejű állás intézménye csillaggal jelölve és vastag betűvel kiemelve. | form of membership | starting date of membership | date of termination of membership |
---|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
| Péter Takács | Doctoral School of Public Administration Sciences | Széchenyi István University, Győr*; National University of Public Service, Budapest | Core member | 2013-01-02 | 2013-09-01 |
| Erzsébet Szalayné Sándor | Doctoral School of Public Administration Sciences | University of Pécs*; National University of Public Service, Budapest | Core member | 2014-03-04 | 2016-09-01 |
| András Nemeslaki | Doctoral School of Public Administration Sciences | Budapest University of Technology and Economics*; National University of Public Service, Budapest | Core member | 2013-01-02 | 2018-02-19 |
| Éva Jakab | Doctoral School of Public Administration Sciences | Károli Gáspár University of the Reformed Church, Budapest*; National University of Public Service, Budapest | Core member | 2017-04-13 | 2018-09-30 |
| Mária Bordás | Doctoral School of Public Administration Sciences | National University of Public Service, Budapest* | Core member | 2013-01-02 | 2019-01-19 |
| Péter Halmai | Doctoral School of Public Administration Sciences | Budapest University of Technology and Economics*; National University of Public Service, Budapest | Core member | 2017-03-14 | 2019-09-24 |
| Péter Smuk | Doctoral School of Public Administration Sciences | Széchenyi István University, Győr*; National University of Public Service, Budapest | Core member | 2020-02-02 | 2021-09-01 |
| Gábor Török | Doctoral School of Public Administration Sciences | National University of Public Service, Budapest* | Core member | 2013-01-02 | 2022-08-28 |
| Csaba Lentner | Doctoral School of Public Administration Sciences | National University of Public Service, Budapest* | Core member | 2013-01-02 | 2023-01-01 |