| name | name of doctoral school | institution Teljes munkaidejű állás intézménye csillaggal jelölve és vastag betűvel kiemelve. | form of membership | starting date of membership | date of termination of membership |
---|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
| Róbert Angelusz | PhD (doctoral) School of Sociology | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2010-09-01 |
| Judit Bíró | PhD (doctoral) School of Sociology | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2013-12-10 | 2014-12-31 |
| Ágnes Darvas | PhD (doctoral) School of Sociology | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2013-12-10 | 2018-09-01 |
| Zsuzsa Ferge | PhD (doctoral) School of Sociology | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2010-08-30 |
| Nikosz Fokasz | PhD (doctoral) School of Sociology | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2013-06-01 | 2023-02-26 |
| Gábor Halmai | PhD (doctoral) School of Sociology | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2015-12-31 |
| Tibor Huszár | PhD (doctoral) School of Sociology | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2010-08-31 |
| Zoltán Kaló | PhD (doctoral) School of Sociology | Semmelweis University, Budapest*; Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest | Core member | 2017-03-31 | 2019-06-30 |
| Dénes Némedi | PhD (doctoral) School of Sociology | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2010-10-01 |
| Antal Örkény | PhD (doctoral) School of Sociology | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2024-05-14 |
| Éva Orosz | PhD (doctoral) School of Sociology | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2013-12-31 |
| Éva Orosz | PhD (doctoral) School of Sociology | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2019-11-21 | 2021-10-26 |
| Péter Pete | PhD (doctoral) School of Sociology | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2013-09-01 | 2013-10-01 |
| Péter Róbert | PhD (doctoral) School of Sociology | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2010-09-30 |
| Tamás Rudas | PhD (doctoral) School of Sociology | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2023-02-26 |
| Péter Somlai | PhD (doctoral) School of Sociology | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2018-08-30 |
| Mária Székelyi | PhD (doctoral) School of Sociology | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2016-02-16 |
| Katalin Tausz | PhD (doctoral) School of Sociology | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2015-10-01 | 2020-06-20 |
| Katalin Tausz | PhD (doctoral) School of Sociology | Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest* | Core member | 2015-09-01 | 2021-10-26 |
| Zoltán Vokó | PhD (doctoral) School of Sociology | Semmelweis University, Budapest*; Eötvös Loránd University, Budapest | Core member | 2015-09-21 | 2019-06-30 |