| name | name of doctoral school | institution Teljes munkaidejű állás intézménye csillaggal jelölve és vastag betűvel kiemelve. | form of membership | starting date of membership | date of termination of membership |
---|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
| György Heltai | Doctoral School of Environmental Sciences | Hungarian University of Agriculture and Life Sciences, Gödöllő* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2016-04-12 |
| Attila Barczi | Doctoral School of Environmental Sciences | Hungarian University of Agriculture and Life Sciences, Gödöllő* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2016-09-13 |
| György Füleky | Doctoral School of Environmental Sciences | Hungarian University of Agriculture and Life Sciences, Gödöllő* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2015-02-19 |
| Ferenc Gyulai | Doctoral School of Environmental Sciences | Hungarian University of Agriculture and Life Sciences, Gödöllő* | Core member | 2012-03-28 | 2022-10-04 |
| György Várallyay | Doctoral School of Environmental Sciences | Hungarian University of Agriculture and Life Sciences, Gödöllő* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2018-12-20 |
| Ágnes Mészárosné Bálint | Doctoral School of Environmental Sciences | Universitas Budensis*; Hungarian University of Agriculture and Life Sciences, Gödöllő | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2014-09-08 |
| Sándor Szoboszlay | Doctoral School of Environmental Sciences | Hungarian University of Agriculture and Life Sciences, Gödöllő* | Core member | 2013-06-04 | 2016-04-14 |
| Imre Czinkota | Doctoral School of Environmental Sciences | Hungarian University of Agriculture and Life Sciences, Gödöllő* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2014-01-31 |
| Pál Scheiber | Doctoral School of Environmental Sciences | Hungarian University of Agriculture and Life Sciences, Gödöllő* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2013-01-01 |
| Péter Nemes | Doctoral School of Environmental Sciences | University of Veterinary Medicine Budapest*; Hungarian University of Agriculture and Life Sciences, Gödöllő | Core member | 2010-05-28 | 2011-02-10 |
| Éva Lehoczky | Doctoral School of Environmental Sciences | Hungarian University of Agriculture and Life Sciences, Gödöllő* | Core member | 2012-09-18 | 2016-09-13 |
| Zoltán Győri | Doctoral School of Environmental Sciences | University of Debrecen*; Hungarian University of Agriculture and Life Sciences, Gödöllő | Core member | 2014-06-23 | 2015-09-30 |
| György Végvári | Doctoral School of Environmental Sciences | Eszterházy Károly Catholic University*; Hungarian University of Agriculture and Life Sciences, Gödöllő | Core member | 2016-02-17 | 2022-11-30 |
| Ákos Horváth | Doctoral School of Environmental Sciences | Hungarian University of Agriculture and Life Sciences, Gödöllő* | Core member | 2020-09-01 | 2021-08-13 |