| name | name of doctoral school | institution Teljes munkaidejű állás intézménye csillaggal jelölve és vastag betűvel kiemelve. | form of membership | starting date of membership | date of termination of membership |
---|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
| Péter Baranyi | Multidisciplinary Doctoral School of Engineering Sciences | University of Pannonia*; Széchenyi István University, Győr | Core member | 2014-09-23 | 2023-06-30 |
| Péter Várlaki | Multidisciplinary Doctoral School of Engineering Sciences | Széchenyi István University, Győr* | Core member | 2009-09-28 | 2022-07-31 |
| Árpád Csík | Multidisciplinary Doctoral School of Engineering Sciences | Széchenyi István University, Győr* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2020-06-30 |
| András Edelmayer | Multidisciplinary Doctoral School of Engineering Sciences | Széchenyi István University, Győr | Core member | 2009-12-02 | 2019-07-15 |
| László Gáspár | Multidisciplinary Doctoral School of Engineering Sciences | Széchenyi István University, Győr* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2018-02-19 |
| István Lakatos | Multidisciplinary Doctoral School of Engineering Sciences | Széchenyi István University, Győr* | Core member | 2017-03-15 | 2017-09-05 |
| Richard Ray | Multidisciplinary Doctoral School of Engineering Sciences | Széchenyi István University, Győr* | Core member | 2013-04-01 | 2015-08-31 |
| Attila Koppány | Multidisciplinary Doctoral School of Engineering Sciences | Széchenyi István University, Győr | Core member | 2013-04-01 | 2015-08-31 |
| Péter Holló | Multidisciplinary Doctoral School of Engineering Sciences | Széchenyi István University, Győr | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2015-01-30 |
| Gábor Winkler | Multidisciplinary Doctoral School of Engineering Sciences | Széchenyi István University, Győr* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2013-09-22 |
| János Égert | Multidisciplinary Doctoral School of Engineering Sciences | Széchenyi István University, Győr* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2013-07-01 |
| Csaba Gáspár | Multidisciplinary Doctoral School of Engineering Sciences | Széchenyi István University, Győr* | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2013-07-01 |
| László Szeidl | Multidisciplinary Doctoral School of Engineering Sciences | Universitas Budensis*; Széchenyi István University, Győr | Core member | 2011-04-27 | 2013-05-31 |
| András Bakó | Multidisciplinary Doctoral School of Engineering Sciences | Széchenyi István University, Győr | Core member | 2007-11-01 | 2011-08-31 |